This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 06:50:22 (UTC).

Salicrup-De Jesus v. Hernandez-Perez et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Salicrup-De Jesus filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hernandez-Perez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Francisco A. Besosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01011

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Francisco A. Besosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Domingo Salicrup-De Jesus

Catano, PR 00962-00963

Defendants

Eligio Hernandez-Perez

Yovanna Gonzalez-Torres

Carlos Mendez

Grisell Batalla

Wendy Colon-Martinez

Sarai Resto

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Category Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Domingo Salicrup-De Jesus, Pro Se. Responses due by 1/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ab) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

2 #4

Summons

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Domingo Salicrup-De Jesus, Pro Se. Responses due by 1/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ab) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Domingo Salicrup-De Jesus, Pro Se. Service due by 4/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons)(ab) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

3 #1

Affidavit

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #3

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel: DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/16/2020. (brc) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: DENIED. Plaintiff has sufficient asset to pay fees and costs. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/16/2020. (brc) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Domingo Salicrup-De Jesus, Pro Se. Responses due by 1/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ab) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Domingo Salicrup-De Jesus, Pro Se. Service due by 4/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons)(ab) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Domingo Salicrup-De Jesus, Pro Se. Responses due by 1/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ab) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.