This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:21:34 (UTC).

Salgado et al v. Victor Kathol et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Salgado filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Victor Kathol. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Daniel D. Crabtree. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02495

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Crabtree

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Salgado

Kaitlei Salgado

Defendants

Victor Kathol

Estate of Victor Kathol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Kinsman

Attorney at Krause & Kinsman, LLC

4717 Grand Avenue, Suite 250

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Salgado, Kaitlei Salgado. Estate of Victor Kathol waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Kinsman, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

1 #2

Designation of Place of Trial

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4899497.), filed by Michael Salgado, Kaitlei Salgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation of Place of Trial)(Kinsman, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Salgado, Kaitlei Salgado. Estate of Victor Kathol waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Kinsman, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4899497.), filed by Michael Salgado, Kaitlei Salgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation of Place of Trial)(Kinsman, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.