This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:42:02 (UTC).

Salgado et al v. Blackwell et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Salgado filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Blackwell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01130

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul Salgado

Kevin Taylor

Defendants

Susan Prentice

John Doe

Michael Melvin

Taylor

Cox

Hallie Zingre

Blackwell

Teri Kennedy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian M Orozco

Attorney at GREGORY E KULIS AND ASSOCIATES

Suite 2140, 30 N Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Gregory E Kulis

Attorney at GREGORY E KULIS AND ASSOCIATES

Suite 2140, 30 N Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

Remy Taborga

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ILLINOIS ATTORNEY GENERAL

1776 E Washington Street

Urbana, IL 61802

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/19. See written Order. (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/19 setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 8/15/19 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Blackwell, Cox, Teri Kennedy, Michael Melvin, Taylor, Hallie Zingre.(Taborga, Remy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Qualified Protective Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Protective Order [UNOPPOSED] by Defendants Blackwell, Cox, Teri Kennedy, Michael Melvin, Taylor, Hallie Zingre. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Qualified Protective Order)(Taborga, Remy) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Remy Taborga on behalf of Blackwell, Cox, Teri Kennedy, Michael Melvin, Taylor, Hallie Zingre (Taborga, Remy) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER of Service of Summons for Hallie Zingre, Ian Cox, Matthew Taylor, Michael Melvin, Paul Blackwell, and Teri Kennedy by Paul Salgado, Kevin Taylor. (Orozco, Brian) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorneys' Lien (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gregory E Kulis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian M Orozco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Orozco, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3085560.), filed by Paul Salgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orozco, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/19. See written Order. (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/19. The Unopposed Motion for Entry of Qualified Protective Order #7 is GRANTED. The Court will entry the parties' proposed protective order as a separate docket entry. (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/19 setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 8/15/19 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Blackwell, Cox, Teri Kennedy, Michael Melvin, Taylor, Hallie Zingre.(Taborga, Remy) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Protective Order [UNOPPOSED] by Defendants Blackwell, Cox, Teri Kennedy, Michael Melvin, Taylor, Hallie Zingre. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Qualified Protective Order)(Taborga, Remy) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Remy Taborga on behalf of Blackwell, Cox, Teri Kennedy, Michael Melvin, Taylor, Hallie Zingre (Taborga, Remy) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER of Service of Summons for Hallie Zingre, Ian Cox, Matthew Taylor, Michael Melvin, Paul Blackwell, and Teri Kennedy by Paul Salgado, Kevin Taylor. (Orozco, Brian) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce and Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long for all further proceedings. Judge Joe Billy McDade and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley no longer assigned to case. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/17/19. (FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorneys' Lien (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gregory E Kulis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kulis, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian M Orozco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Orozco, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3085560.), filed by Paul Salgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orozco, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less