This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 08:05:41 (UTC).

Sales Transaction Systems LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Sales Transaction Systems LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00764

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sales Transaction Systems LLC

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cabrach J. Connor

John M. Shumaker

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16235814). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (zv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sales Transaction Systems LLC re #1 Complaint (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A answer due 8/31/2022. (lad) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sales Transaction Systems LLC re #1 Complaint (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (zv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16235814). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less