This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 09:27:43 (UTC).

Sales Transaction Systems LLC v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Sales Transaction Systems LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Derek T. Gilliland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00763

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sales Transaction Systems LLC

Defendant

Bank of America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cabrach J. Connor

John M. Shumaker

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16235788). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) Summons will not be issued due to incorrect party listed. Plaintiff's counsel has been contacted to refile corrected Request For Issuance of Summons (zv). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (zv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sales Transaction Systems LLC re #1 Complaint (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sales Transaction Systems LLC re #1 Complaint (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

08/23/2022

DocketReset Deadlines: Bank of America Corporation answer due 9/30/2022. (zv) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sales Transaction Systems LLC re #1 Complaint (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022

DocketReset Deadlines: Bank of America Corporation answer due 8/31/2022. (zv) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sales Transaction Systems LLC re #1 Complaint (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (zv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) Summons will not be issued due to incorrect party listed. Plaintiff's counsel has been contacted to refile corrected Request For Issuance of Summons (zv). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16235788). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Sales Transaction Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less