This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2021 at 07:17:13 (UTC).

Salerno v. Silva et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Salerno filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Silva. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02685

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Salerno

Defendants

Premier Trailer Leasing, Inc.

Transport I-70, LLC

Leonel Silva

Leonel Carmona Silva

Land Air Express

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin B Kelly

Attorney at The Vrdolyak Law Group, LLC

100 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Lara R Lickhalter

Attorney at Cassiday Schade

20 N. Wacker Dr., Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60606

James A. Foster

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

222 West Adams Street, Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

17 #1

Notice of Filing

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Exhibit

#14

12 #1

Notice of Filing

3 #1

Status Report Requirements

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. D

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to amended complaint by Leonel Carmona Silva, Transport I-70, LLC(Lickhalter, Lara) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Land Air Express, Inc.'s Registered Agent Cheryl A. Jackson on 6/23/2021 by Plaintiff Joseph Salerno. Waiver of service due by 7/23/2021. (Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First AMENDED complaint by Joseph Salerno against Leonel Silva, Transport I-70, LLC, Land Air Express (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Plaintiff's motion #14 to file amended complaint adding proposed Defendant Land Air Express, Inc. is granted. The Plaintiff shall promptly file the pleading on the docket as a separate entry and begin service (or waiver) efforts quickly so that the new defendant can catch-up in discovery. For future reference, under the operative Amended General Order 20-0012, Local Rule 5.3(b) is suspended, so motions should not be noticed for presentment. Emailed notice (eec) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin B Kelly for presentment of motion to amend/correct #14 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/21/2021 at 08:30 AM. (Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION by Plaintiff Joseph Salerno to amend/correct compliant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #12 , under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the case is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Premier Trailer Leasing, INC. All dates previously set on 05/28/2021, R.8, to remain unchanged as to the remaining parties. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Salerno (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AGREED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO HIPAA Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 06/11/2021. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants' motion or protective order HIPAA #9 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendants Leonel Silva, Transport I-70, LLC for protective order HIPAA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Lickhalter, Lara) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, R. 7, the Court sets the following schedule. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due 07/01/2021. The first round of written discovery requests must be issued by 07/15/2021. Fact discovery, including any treating health care providers (if any), must be completed by 03/01/2022. Rule 26(a)(2)(C) summaries for treating health care providers (if any) must be disclosed 75 days in advance of the fact discovery deadline, and adjusts with any general extension of fact discovery deadline. Rule 16(b) deadline to add parties or amend pleadings is 12/14/2021.The deadline to serve subpoenas is 01/10/2022, absent good cause (e.g., genuine surprise despite due diligence). By 01/10/2022, the parties shall file a Deposition Scheduling Report listing the depositions already taken and (more importantly) the remaining deponents, all of whom must have ***confirmed*** deposition dates (not just proposed dates). Any person not on that Report will presumptively not be deposed without good cause (e.g., genuine surprise despite due diligence). If deponents are slow in confirming deposition dates, the parties should use the Report deadline to urge each other and non-parties to provide confirmed dates to avoid a motion to compel in advance of the deadline. The Court will set the retained expert discovery schedule at a later time. The tracking status hearing of 06/18/2021 is reset to 08/20/2021 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file a discovery progress report by 08/13/2021. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS Report Joint by Joseph Salerno (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Leonel Silva, Transport I-70, LLC by James A. Foster (Foster, James) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph Salerno by Benjamin B Kelly (Kelly, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Leonel Silva, Transport I-70, LLC(Lickhalter, Lara) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 06/18/2021 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 06/09/2021. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Leonel Silva, Transport I-70, LLC by Lara R Lickhalter (Lickhalter, Lara) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois, case number (2021 L 066030) filed by Leonel Silva, Transport I-70, LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18259697. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lickhalter, Lara) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAND AIR EXPRESS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Premier Trailer Leasing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin B Kelly