This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2019 at 07:42:50 (UTC).

Salerno v. MPI Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Salerno filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MPI Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosemary A Salerno

Defendants

Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC

MPI Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric W Smith

Attorney at Siro Smith Dickson PC

1621 Baltimore Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64108

Ryan Patrick McEnaney

Attorney at Siro Smith Dickson, PC

1621 Baltimore Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64108

Rik N. Siro

Attorney at Siro Smith Dickson, PC

1621 Baltimore Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64108

Raymond Dake

Attorney at Siro Smith Dickson, PC

1621 Baltimore Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64108

Athena M. Dickson

Attorney at Siro Smith Dickson, PC

1621 Baltimore Avenue

Kansas City, MO 64108

Defendant Attorneys

Jessie F Bustamante

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP-KCMO

4900 Main Street, Suite 650

Kansas City, MO 64112

Samuel N Lillard

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP-Columbus

250 West Street, Suite 400

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Rosemary A Salerno. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. Teleconference set for 5/22/2020, 1:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 01:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 4/18/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of filing Certificate of Service by MPI Management, LLC (Lillard, Samuel) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosemary A Salerno to Defendant Zona Rosa Town Center LLC filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosemary A Salerno Defendant MPI Management LLC d/b/a Olshan Properties filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES Plaintiff's filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#10

(#10) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Rosemary A Salerno. (Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#9

(#9) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rosemary A Salerno. (Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of MPI Management, LLC, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC.(Bustamante, Jessie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

5 #1

Exhibit Court Admissions

#5

(#5) Motion to allow Samuel N. Lillard to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6197562) filed by Jessie F Bustamante on behalf of MPI Management, LLC, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bustamante, Jessie) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER.RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/1/2019. Signed on 2/28/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

3 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jessie F Bustamante on behalf of Defendants MPI Management, LLC d/b/a Olshan Properties, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC.(Bustamante, Jessie) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Rosemary A Salerno. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (Jones, Robin) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. Teleconference set for 5/22/2020, 1:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 01:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 4/18/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of filing Certificate of Service by MPI Management, LLC (Lillard, Samuel) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosemary A Salerno to Defendant Zona Rosa Town Center LLC filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosemary A Salerno Defendant MPI Management LLC d/b/a Olshan Properties filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES Plaintiff's filed by Athena M. Dickson on behalf of Plaintiff Rosemary A Salerno.(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Rosemary A Salerno. (Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rosemary A Salerno. (Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of MPI Management, LLC, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC.(Bustamante, Jessie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Samuel N Lillard for MPI Management, LLC,Samuel N Lillard for Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to allow Samuel N. Lillard to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6197562) filed by Jessie F Bustamante on behalf of MPI Management, LLC, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bustamante, Jessie) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER.RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/1/2019. Signed on 2/28/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jessie F Bustamante on behalf of Defendants MPI Management, LLC d/b/a Olshan Properties, Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC.(Bustamante, Jessie) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 1916-CV02990, filed by Jessie F Bustamante on behalf of Zona Rosa Town Center, LLC, MPI Management, LLC d/b/a Olshan Properties. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6192757. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 -- State Court File, #3 Exhibit 3 -- MPI Management, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Zona Rosa)(Bustamante, Jessie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.