This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:45:55 (UTC).

Salem et al v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Salem filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia D. Barksdale and Marcia Morales Howard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Salem

Sandra Salem

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Shakib

Attorney at Terrell Hogan, PA

8Th Floor, 233 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #2

Consent Letter and Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16319014) filed by Sandra Salem, John Salem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shakib, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

3 #1

Case Management Report Form

#3

(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#4

(#4) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case electronically to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (SJW) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of California as case 3:20-cv-1360, filed on 02/24/2020. (AFC) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case electronically to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (SJW) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-6-J-34PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16319014) filed by Sandra Salem, John Salem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shakib, Christopher) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.