This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:45:54 (UTC).

Salem et al v. Michigan State University et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Salem filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan State University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Talal Salem

Salina Ramli

Defendants

Michigan State University

Venkatesh Kodur

Metna Co.

Parviz Soroushian

Michigan State University Board of Trustees

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nakisha Nicole Chaney

Attorney at Salvatore Prescott, PLLC

105 E Main St.

Northville, MI 48167

Jennifer B. Salvatore

Attorney at Salvatore Prescott, PLLC

105 E Main St.

Northville, MI 48167

Defendant Attorneys

John M. Lichtenberg

Attorney at Rhoades McKee P.C.

300 Riverfront Plaza Bldg., 55 Campau Ave., Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Paul A. McCarthy

Attorney at Rhoades McKee P.C.

300 Riverfront Plaza Bldg., 55 Campau Ave., Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Scott E. Dwyer

Attorney at Mika Meyers PLC

900 Monroe Ave., Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Lisa C. Ward

Attorney at Law Offices of Lisa C. Ward, PLLC

4131 Okemos Rd., Ste. 12

Okemos, MI 48864

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#31

(#31) NOTICE re #28 - Joint Statement Filing re #24 by plaintiffs Salina Ramli, Talal Salem (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#30

(#30) NOTICE re #28 - Joint Statement Filing re #21 by plaintiffs Salina Ramli, Talal Salem (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#29

(#29) NOTICE re #28 - Joint Statement Filing re #8 by plaintiff Talal Salem (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#28

(#28) ORDER denying #8 #21 and #24 requests for pre-motion conference; Joint Statement due not later than June 17, 2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#27

(#27) RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees #24 ; filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#26

(#26) RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Venkatesh Kodur #21 ; filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#24

(#24) REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Lichtenberg, John) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#21

(#26) RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Venkatesh Kodur #21 ; filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#19

(#25) ORDER granting motions for extension of time #19 , #22 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#8

(#28) ORDER denying #8 #21 and #24 requests for pre-motion conference; Joint Statement due not later than June 17, 2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Metna Co. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; (Chaney, Nakisha) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (ns). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Parviz Soroushian served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Metna Co. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Venkatesh Kodur, Metna Co., Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Parviz Soroushian (ns) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#1

(#23) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #22 filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Lichtenberg, John) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE re #28 - Joint Statement Filing re #24 by plaintiffs Salina Ramli, Talal Salem (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE re #28 - Joint Statement Filing re #21 by plaintiffs Salina Ramli, Talal Salem (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE re #28 - Joint Statement Filing re #8 by plaintiff Talal Salem (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER denying #8 #21 and #24 requests for pre-motion conference; Joint Statement due not later than June 17, 2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees #24 ; filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Venkatesh Kodur #21 ; filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting motions for extension of time #19 , #22 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Lichtenberg, John) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #22 filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Lichtenberg, John) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Metna Co. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; (Chaney, Nakisha) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (ns). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Parviz Soroushian served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Metna Co. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Venkatesh Kodur, Metna Co., Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Parviz Soroushian (ns) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Venkatesh Kodur, Metna Co., Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Parviz Soroushian ; none provided (ns) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jennifer B. Salvatore on behalf of plaintiffs Salina Ramli, Talal Salem (Salvatore, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Salina Ramli, Talal Salem in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4394545 (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Talal Salem, Salina Ramli (Chaney, Nakisha) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less