This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:13:04 (UTC).

Saleem v. Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Saleem filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert D. Mariani and CA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01413

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

Referral Judge

CA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohammad Sohail Saleem

Camp Hill, PA 17001

Defendants

Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania

Department of Corrections

C.O. 1 Bickle

C.O. 1 Hanes

C.O. 1 Ostrofsky

Unit Manager Kuhn

Captain Dyke

Superintendent Garman

N. Paul

Amanda West

Donna Varner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Karen Mascio Romano

Attorney at Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Nicole J. Boland

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Exhibit(s) Shambaugh Declartion

#7

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

2 #1

Notice of Consent

#2

1 #2

Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas of Centre County and Certificate o

1 #1

Civil Action Complaint from Court of Common Pleas of Centre County Docket No. 2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT OF FACTS re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by C.O. 1 Bickle, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department of Corrections, Captain Dyke, Superintendent Garman, C.O. 1 Hanes, Unit Manager Kuhn, C.O. 1 Ostrofsky, N. Paul, Donna Varner, Amanda West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Shambaugh Declartion)(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by C.O. 1 Bickle, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department of Corrections, Captain Dyke, Superintendent Garman, C.O. 1 Hanes, Unit Manager Kuhn, C.O. 1 Ostrofsky, N. Paul, Donna Varner, Amanda West.(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by C.O. 1 Bickle, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department of Corrections, Captain Dyke, Superintendent Garman, C.O. 1 Hanes, Unit Manager Kuhn, C.O. 1 Ostrofsky, N. Paul, Donna Varner, Amanda West. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to file response to Plaintiff's complaint. On or before 9/20/21 Defts. shall file a responsive pleading. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/20/21 (jam) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Responsive Pleading by C.O. 1 Bickle, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department of Corrections, Captain Dyke, Superintendent Garman, C.O. 1 Hanes, Unit Manager Kuhn, C.O. 1 Ostrofsky, N. Paul, Donna Varner, Amanda West. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Donna Varner, C.O. 1 Hanes, N. Paul, Unit Manager Kuhn, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, C.O. 1 Ostrofsky, Captain Dyke, C.O. 1 Bickle, Superintendent Garman, Amanda West, Department of Corrections from Court of Common Pleas of Centre County, case number 2021-1557. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5666439), filed by Donna Varner, C.O. 1 Hanes, N. Paul, Unit Manager Kuhn, Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, C.O. 1 Ostrofsky, Captain Dyke, C.O. 1 Bickle, Superintendent Garman, Amanda West, Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Complaint from Court of Common Pleas of Centre County Docket No. 2021-1557, #2 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas of Centre County and Certificate of Service thereof.)(lp) Modified on 8/12/2021 (lp). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole J. Boland Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Mascio Romano