This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:03:32 (UTC).

Saleba v. Medpace, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Saleba filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Medpace, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. McFarland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00634

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. McFarland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Saleba

Defendant

Medpace, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randolph Harry Freking

Attorney at Freking Myers & Reul LLC

600 Vine Street, Ninth Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant Attorneys

David Kirsten Montgomery

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

26Th Floor, 201 East Fifth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Robert D. Shank

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

201 E. Fifth Street, Pnc Center, 26Th Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Shank for Defendant Medpace, Inc. (Shank, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Medpace, Inc.. (Montgomery, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David Kirsten Montgomery for Defendant Medpace, Inc. (Montgomery, David) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medpace, Inc. on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Freking, Randolph) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Separation Agreement and General Release

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Age Discrimination, Collective against Medpace, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7610744), filed by Paul Saleba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Separation Agreement and General Release, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Freking, Randolph) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Shank for Defendant Medpace, Inc. (Shank, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Medpace, Inc.. (Montgomery, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David Kirsten Montgomery for Defendant Medpace, Inc. (Montgomery, David) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medpace, Inc. on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Freking, Randolph) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Age Discrimination, Collective against Medpace, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7610744), filed by Paul Saleba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Separation Agreement and General Release, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Freking, Randolph) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less