This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2020 at 08:54:32 (UTC).

Sale v. Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, LTD et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Sale filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20716

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jon Sale, as Receiver

Miami, FL 33131

Jon A. Sale

Miami, FL 33131

Defendants

Jumbleberry Interactive Group, LTD

Jumbleberry Publishing Group, LTD

Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Everett Baldwin

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Broad and Cassel

1 Financial Plaza #2700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Daniel Stuart Newman

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Broad and Cassel

2 S Biscayne Boulevard, One Biscayne Tower 21St Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Gary Michael Freedman

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Broad and Cassel

One Biscayne Tower, 2 S. Biscayne Blvd., 21St Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Christopher Cole Cavallo

2 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 21

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, LTD, Jumbleberry Interactive Group, LTD, Jumbleberry Publishing Group, LTD, (cqs) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jon A. Sale (Baldwin, William) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters and Notice of Court Practices and Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Order Appointing Receiver

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12479163, filed by Jon Sale, as Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Appointing Receiver, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldwin, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, LTD, Jumbleberry Interactive Group, LTD, Jumbleberry Publishing Group, LTD, (cqs) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jon A. Sale (Baldwin, William) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters and Notice of Court Practices and Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12479163, filed by Jon Sale, as Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Appointing Receiver, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldwin, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Everett Baldwin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Stuart Newman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Cole Cavallo