Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2021 at 08:54:42 (UTC).

Saldana v. Covidien, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Saldana filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Covidien, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00108

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virginia Saldana

Defendants

Covidien, L.P.

Medtronic, Inc.

Bexar County Hospital District doing business as University Health System

University of Texas Health Science Center of San Antonio doing business as UT Health San Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. John Prudhomme

Attorney at Cagle Law Firm, P.C.

5300 Bee Cave Road, Bldg I, Suite 240

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

Norma N. Bennett

Attorney at Shook Hardy and Bacon LLP

600 Travis Street Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

David McDonald Prichard

Attorney at Prichard Young, L.L.P.

10101 Reunion Place, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Mark David Wolfe

Attorney at Prichard Young, LLP

10101 Reunion Place, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Bryan T. Pratt

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Laura Anne Cavaretta

Attorney at Cavaretta, Katona & Leighner, PLLC

One Riverwalk Place, 700 North St. Mary'S St., Suite 1500

San Antonio, TX 78205

Matthew Jason Warner

Attorney at Texas Attorney General's Office

P.O. Box 12548, 300 West 15Th St. - Flr 12

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING #20 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference filed by Virginia Saldana., ( Status Conference Re-set for 3/31/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Virginia Saldana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prudhomme, R.) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#19

(#19) ***NOTIFIED ATTORNEY, MOTION HAS WRONG NUMBER, RE-FILE MOTION ****DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference (wg) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, MOTION HAS WRONG CASE NUMBER ***Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Virginia Saldana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prudhomme, R.) Modified on 3/22/2021 (wg). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Norma N. Bennett for Bryan T. Pratt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14570481) by on behalf of Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Norma) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) 2nd SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE of Removal by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, SECOND, filed by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Prichard, David) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (wg). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING #20 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference filed by Virginia Saldana., ( Status Conference Re-set for 3/31/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Virginia Saldana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prudhomme, R.) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ***NOTIFIED ATTORNEY, MOTION HAS WRONG NUMBER, RE-FILE MOTION ****DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference (wg) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT, MOTION HAS WRONG CASE NUMBER ***Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Virginia Saldana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prudhomme, R.) Modified on 3/22/2021 (wg). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted leave to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dc3) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Norma N. Bennett for Bryan T. Pratt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14570481) by on behalf of Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Norma) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS, (Status Conference set for 3/24/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/19/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2021, Discovery due by 2/3/2022, Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2022. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Virginia Saldana. (Prudhomme, R.) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NON-CONSENT to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Medtronic, Inc. Prichard, David) Modified on 3/8/2021 (rg). (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 2nd SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE of Removal by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, SECOND, filed by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Prichard, David) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (wg). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE of Removal by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Prichard, David) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (wg). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc. . (Prichard, David) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/5/2021,) Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter forwarded to atty: John Ackley. (wg) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter forwarded to atty: Bryan T. Pratt. (wg) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14451973), filed by Covidien, L.P., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Prichard, David) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON (THE) is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Anne Cavaretta