This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 10:28:51 (UTC).

Saldana-Caban v. Grupo HIMA San Pablo Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Saldana-Caban filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Grupo HIMA San Pablo Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01019

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arlynn Saldaa Cabn

Arlynn Saldana-Caban

Defendants

Grupo HIMA San Pablo Inc.

Centro Mdico del Turbo, Inc, d/b/a Hospital HIMA San Pablo Bayamn

Ave Luis Muoz Marn 100

Caguas, PR 00725

ABC Insurance Company

Dr. Carlo A Hernndez Romn

The Conjugal Partnership Composed by Dr. Carlo A. Hernndez Romn and his Wife Jane Doe

DEF Insurance Company

John Doe Corporation

GHI Insurance Company

Centro Medico del Turbo, Inc. doing business as Hospital HIMA San Pablo Bayamon

Ave Luis Muoz Marn 100

Caguas, PR 00725

Dr. Carlo A. Hernandez-Roman

Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jose Luis Ubarri-Garcia

Attorney at Ubarri & Roman

Po Box 79564

Carolina, PR 00984-9564

Defendant Attorneys

Jose A. Miranda-Daleccio

Attorney at Miranda Cardenas & Cordova

P.O. Box 9023998

San Juan, PR 00902-3998

Eugene F. Hestres-Velez

Attorney at Bird, Bird & Hestres

Po Box 9024040

Old San Juan, PR 00902-4040

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Summons Grupo HIMA San Pablo

1 #4

Summons Centro Medico del Turbo, d/b/a Hospital HIMA San Pablo Bayamon

1 #5

Summons Dr. Carlo A. Hernandez Roman

1 #6

Summons Hernandez Roman Conjugal Partnership

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Jose A. Miranda-Daleccio on behalf of Centro Medico del Turbo, Inc. Responses due by 3/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Daleccio, Jose) Modified on 2/16/2022 to correct event (mcm). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance and for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Carlo A. Hernandez-Roman (Hestres-Velez, Eugene) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jose A. Miranda-Daleccio on behalf of Defendant Centro Medico del Turbo, Inc..(Miranda-Daleccio, Jose) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jose A. Miranda-Daleccio on behalf of Defendant Centro Medico del Turbo, Inc..(Miranda-Daleccio, Jose) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Noting and Granting #6 "Notice of Appearance as Counsel of Record and for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead, with Memorandum of Law in Support." The appearing defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by March 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/18/2022. (ebb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance and for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Carlo A. Hernandez-Roman (Hestres-Velez, Eugene) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Noting and Granting #4 "Notice of Appearance." The appearing defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by March 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/16/2022. (ebb) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Jose A. Miranda-Daleccio on behalf of Centro Medico del Turbo, Inc. Responses due by 3/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Daleccio, Jose) Modified on 2/16/2022 to correct event (mcm). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Centro Medico del Turbo, Inc., Grupo HIMA San Pablo Inc., Dr. Carlo A. Hernandez Roman, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7592982.), filed by Arlynn Saldaa Cabn. Service due by 4/11/2022, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Grupo HIMA San Pablo, #4 Summons Centro Medico del Turbo, d/b/a Hospital HIMA San Pablo Bayamon, #5 Summons Dr. Carlo A. Hernandez Roman, #6 Summons Hernandez Roman Conjugal Partnership)(Ubarri-Garcia, Jose) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRUPO HIMA SAN PABLO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Doe is a litigant

Latest cases where Centro Medico del Turabo, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GHI Insurance Company is a litigant