This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:49:15 (UTC).

Salcedo v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Salcedo filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank H McCarthy, Jodi F Jayne and John F Heil, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00415

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

Presiding Judges

Frank H McCarthy

John F Heil, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cathrine Ann Salcedo

Catherine Ann Salcedo

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Lowell Harlan

Attorney at John L Harlan & Associates, PC

P O Box 1326

Sapulpa, OK 74067

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Andrew Gallant

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (Tulsa)

110 W 7Th St Ste 300

Tulsa, OK 74119-1013

Melissa Carol Schuenemann

Attorney at Social Security Administration (Denver)

1961 Stout St Ste 4169

Denver, CO 80294

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne ( Administrative Transcript/Record due by 12/18/2020); setting/resetting social security case deadline(s): ; granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Social Security Administration [Note: Attorney Melissa Carol Schuenemann added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (Schuenemann, Melissa) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Andrew Gallant on behalf of Social Security Administration [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Andrew Gallant added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).] (Gallant, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Catherine Ann Salcedo (Harlan, John) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning this case upon the filing of Dkt #6 and pursuant to General Order 16-08. Reassigning case to Judge John F. Heil, III and Magistrate Judge Jodi F. Jayne, changing case number to 20-cv-415-JFH-JFJ (Re: #6 Statement Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Social Security) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Catherine Ann Salcedo (Harlan, John) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct the spelling of plaintiffs name (jjs, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Remark: 3 summons in hold tray (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Catherine Ann Salcedo (Harlan, John) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct the spelling of plaintiffs name (jjs, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Catherine Ann Salcedo (Harlan, John) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct the spelling of plaintiffs name (jjs, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Catherine Ann Salcedo (Harlan, John) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct the spelling of plaintiffs name (jjs, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less