This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2019 at 07:44:04 (UTC).

Salazar v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Salazar filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Collis White and Alia Moses. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Collis White

Presiding Judge

Alia Moses

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Salazar

Defendant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel W. Packard

Attorney at Packard Law Firm

1100 N.W. Loop 410, Suite 104

San Antonio, TX 78213

Defendant Attorney

Noah M. Schottenstein

Attorney at Assistant United States Attorney

601 N.W. Loop 410, Ste. 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Schottenstein, Noah) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Salazar. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Salazar. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jaw) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jaw) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Salazar. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12387824), filed by Mary Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • Set Deadlines: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA responsive pleading due 10/30/2019 (ls) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA responsive pleading due 10/30/2019. entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Schottenstein, Noah) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Salazar. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Salazar. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jaw) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jaw) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Collis White. (jaw) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jaw) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Salazar. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12387824), filed by Mary Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah M. Schottenstein