This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 07:58:37 (UTC).

SALAZAR v. BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by SALAZAR against BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04113

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judges

Tim A. Baker

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR

Indianapolis, IN 46225

Defendant

BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig M. Williams

Attorney at FOX WILLIAMS & SINK LLC

6177 North College Avenue

Indianapolis, IN 46220

Ryan Patrick Sink

Attorney at FOX WILLIAMS & SINK LLC

6177 North College Avenue

Indianapolis, IN 46220

Defendant Attorneys

Michael W. Padgett

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC (Indianapolis)

211 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michael Carl Mohler

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC (Indianapolis)

211 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-4113-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/15/2019. (ADH) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Padgett on behalf of Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Mohler, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC served on 10/28/2019. (Sink, Ryan) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Williams, Craig) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (NAD) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Sink, Ryan) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Summons

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Proposed Summons against BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Sink, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Sink on behalf of Plaintiff NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Sink, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights; EEOC Form 5; Mediation Agreemen

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP066858) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights; EEOC Form 5; Mediation Agreement; Confidentiality Agreement)(AKH) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-4113-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/15/2019. (ADH) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Padgett on behalf of Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendant BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Mohler, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Service, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC served on 10/28/2019. (Sink, Ryan) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig M. Williams on behalf of Plaintiff NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Williams, Craig) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (NAD) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Sink, Ryan) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Proposed Summons against BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Sink, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Sink on behalf of Plaintiff NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Sink, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, filed by NICHOLAS R. SALAZAR. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP066858) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights; EEOC Form 5; Mediation Agreement; Confidentiality Agreement)(AKH) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.