This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:11:49 (UTC).

SALAZAR v. 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SALAZAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-04913

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIGUEL D BENITEZ SALAZAR

Defendants

AEARO HOLDING LLC

AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC

AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC

3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC

AEARO LLC

3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN S LAINE

1104 Orleans Street

Beaumont, TX 77701

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KEVIN S. LAINE.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4736466.) by MIGUEL D BENITEZ SALAZAR. (LAINE, KEVIN) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LAINE, KEVIN) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#21

(#6) AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4730825.), filed by Miguel D. Benitez Salazar. (LAINE, KEVIN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KEVIN S. LAINE. Motion has been terminated, per telephone conversation with attorney on 12/10/2019, motion will be filed in the lead case 3:19md2885. (djb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KEVIN S. LAINE.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4736466.) by MIGUEL D BENITEZ SALAZAR. (LAINE, KEVIN) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LAINE, KEVIN) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - Party names are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. See also: Rule 5.2 Civil Cover Sheet: An attorney who files or removes a civil case must simultaneously file a civil cover sheet on a form available without charge from the Clerk or on the District's website. (djb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4730825.), filed by Miguel D. Benitez Salazar. (LAINE, KEVIN) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less