This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2022 at 10:22:43 (UTC).

Salas v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On September 26, 2022, Dana Salas (“Plaintiff”), represented by Lisa A. Gorshe and Anne R. Rick of Johnson Becker, PLLC, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Sunbeam Products, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory relief and damages for alleged personal injury suffered due to serious and dangerous defects in the Crock-Pot Express Crock Multicooker. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida with Judge Jose E. Martinez presiding.

In the complaint, Plaintiff claimed, “Defendant Sunbeam Products, Inc. designs, manufactures, markets, imports, distributes, and sells a wide-range of consumer products, including the subject ‘Crock-Pot Express Crock Multicooker,’ which specifically includes the Model Number SCCPPC600-V1 (hereinafter referred to as ‘Pressure Cooker(s)’).”

Plaintiff alleged that “Defendant Sunbeam touts that its Pressure Cookers are designed with ‘safety in mind,’ and include supposed ‘safety measures’ such as ‘safety sensors’ that purport to keep the lid from being opened while the unit is under pressure.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Despite Defendant Sunbeam’s claims of ‘safety,’ it designed, manufactured, marketed, imported, distributed, and sold, both directly and through third-party retailers, a product that suffers from serious and dangerous defects. Said defects cause significant risk of bodily harm and injury to its consumers.”

Additionally, Plaintiff alleged that the “said defects manifest themselves when, despite Defendant Sunbeam’s claims to the contrary, the lid of the Pressure Cooker is removable with built-up pressure, heat, and steam still inside the unit.”

Plaintiff also alleged that “[w]hen the lid is removed under such circumstances, the pressure trapped within the unit causes the scalding hot contents to be projected from the unit and into the surrounding area, including onto the unsuspecting consumers, their families and other bystanders. The Plaintiff in this case was able to remove the lid while the Pressure Cooker retained pressure, causing her serious and substantial bodily injuries and damages.”

The plaintiff continued, alleging, “Defendant Sunbeam knew or should have known of these defects but nevertheless put profit ahead of safety by continuing to sell its Pressure Cookers to consumers, failing to warn said consumers of the serious risks posed by the defects, and failing to timely recall the dangerously defective Pressure Cookers despite the risk of significant injuries to Plaintiff and consumers like her.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant Sunbeam ignored and/or concealed its knowledge of these defects in its Pressure Cookers from the Plaintiff in this case, as well as the public in general, in order to continue generating a profit from the sale of said Pressure Cookers, demonstrating a callous, reckless, willful, depraved indifference to the health, safety and welfare of Plaintiff and consumers like her.”

Plaintiff presented two claims for relief, including claims for the alleged strict liability and negligence of Defendant. 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested a judgment for declaratory relief and an award of damages, including punitive damages, compensatory damages, pre- and post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-61815

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Salas

Defendant

Sunbeam Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa Ann Gorshe

Attorney at Johnson Becker PLLC

444 Cedar St Ste 1800

St. Paul, MN 55101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Sunbeam Products, Inc. (mab) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Anna R. Rick, mailing date September 27, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF TRANSFER to Judge Jose E. Martinez for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 9/28/2022. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Anna R. Rick. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15985968 by Dana Salas. Responses due by 10/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gorshe, Lisa) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF TRANSFER to Judge Jose E. Martinez for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 9/28/2022. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Anna R. Rick, mailing date September 27, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Sunbeam Products, Inc. (mab) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sunbeam Products, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15979287, filed by Dana Salas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Gorshe, Lisa) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunbeam Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Ann Gorshe