This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 09:25:16 (UTC).

Glenn Saks v. Medify Air LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Glenn Saks filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Medify Air LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glenn Saks

Defendant

Medify Air LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yana A Hart

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm PC

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Ryan J Clarkson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm PC

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Defendant Attorney

Saul H Perloff

Attorney at Shearman and Sterling, LLP

300 West 6Th Street, 22Nd Floor

Austin, TX 78205

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Declaration of Plaintiff Glenn Saks regarding Venue pursuant to Cal. Civ. Code S

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks. (Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks, (Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks. (Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Medify Air LLC. (et) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks, upon Defendant Medify Air LLC served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), by Judge Cormac J. Carney #10 . Defendant Medify Air LLC answer due 4/11/2022. (twdb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), by Judge Cormac J. Carney #10 . Defendant Medify Air LLC answer due 4/11/2022. (twdb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 11, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Medify Air LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Saul H Perloff added to party Medify Air LLC(pty:dft))(Perloff, Saul) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks, upon Defendant Medify Air LLC served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Medify Air LLC. (et) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks. (Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks, (Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks. (Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32588880 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Glenn Saks. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff Glenn Saks regarding Venue pursuant to Cal. Civ. Code Section 1780(d)) (Attorney Yana A Hart added to party Glenn Saks(pty:pla))(Hart, Yana) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less