This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 08:16:26 (UTC).

Sakellarides v. The Everygirl Media Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Sakellarides filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Everygirl Media Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05156

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eva Sakellarides

Defendant

The Everygirl Media Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig B Sanders

Attorney at Barshay Sanders PLLC

100 Garden City Plazaste 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Charles Gregory Giger

Attorney at Partridge Partners, P.C.

321 North Clark Street, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Exhibit Feb. 24, 2021 order in Ayiomamitis v. The Colossal Shop, Inc., 1:21-cv-0

11 #1

Exhibit Compilation of Documents from Sakellarides v. The Colored Girl, LLC, 1:2

#11

(#11) MOTION by Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLC to continue Defendant's deadline to answer or file responsive pleading, initial status hearing, and joint status report, MOTION by Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 to and including December 22, 2021 (second requested extension), MOTION by Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLCrequesting order for compliance with Local Rule 83.15 and submission of copies of official deposit copies of the copyright application and relevant documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compilation of Documents from Sakellarides v. The Colored Girl, LLC, 1:20-cv-04708 (S.D.N.Y.), #2 Exhibit Feb. 24, 2021 order in Ayiomamitis v. The Colossal Shop, Inc., 1:21-cv-00986 (N.D. Ill.))(Giger, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Everygirl Media Group, LLC (Giger, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLC by Charles Gregory Giger (Giger, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond #7 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 11/22/2021. Initial status hearing set for 12/2/2021 at 9:15 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Eva Sakellarides for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#6

(#6) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jh, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Sakellarides as to The Everygirl Media Group, LLC on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#4

(#4) Additional Copyright Information by Eva Sakellarides (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#3

(#3) MAILED Copyright Request Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel Craig Sanders. (cp, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLC to continue Defendant's deadline to answer or file responsive pleading, initial status hearing, and joint status report, MOTION by Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 to and including December 22, 2021 (second requested extension), MOTION by Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLCrequesting order for compliance with Local Rule 83.15 and submission of copies of official deposit copies of the copyright application and relevant documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compilation of Documents from Sakellarides v. The Colored Girl, LLC, 1:20-cv-04708 (S.D.N.Y.), #2 Exhibit Feb. 24, 2021 order in Ayiomamitis v. The Colossal Shop, Inc., 1:21-cv-00986 (N.D. Ill.))(Giger, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Everygirl Media Group, LLC (Giger, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLC by Charles Gregory Giger (Giger, Charles) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond #7 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 11/22/2021. Initial status hearing set for 12/2/2021 at 9:15 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Eva Sakellarides for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jh, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Sakellarides as to The Everygirl Media Group, LLC on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Additional Copyright Information by Eva Sakellarides (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Everygirl Media Group, LLC (jf, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAILED Copyright Request Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel Craig Sanders. (cp, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eva Sakellarides by Craig B Sanders (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Eva Sakellarides; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18719385. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Gregory Giger