This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:40:10 (UTC).

Saka v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Saka filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04716

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathleen Saka

Richmond, TX 77469

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sam Shapiro

Attorney at The Estes Law Firm

716 S Union St

Richmond, TX 77469

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Ramirez

Attorney at Bush Ramirez, LLC

5615 Kirby Dr, Ste 900

Houston, TX 77005

Marmar Kahkeshani

Attorney at Bush Ramirez

5615 Kirby, Ste 900

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

2 #2

Proposed Order Order on Remand

2 #1

Exhibit Agreed Stipulation

#2

(#2) Agreed MOTION to Remand by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order Order on Remand)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court)

1 #3

Exhibit Original Answer (State Court)

1 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 458th District Court, Fort Bend, case number 19-dcv-267998 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23695895) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #4 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to Clerk at 458th Jud. District Court, executed on 1/9/2020 re: Document(s) Sent, - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 1/9/2020 re: Document(s) Sent,, filed. (dhansen, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Agreed MOTION to Remand by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order Order on Remand)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 458th District Court, Fort Bend, case number 19-dcv-267998 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23695895) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #4 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less