This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 08:32:54 (UTC).

Saitta v. Arizona, State of et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Saitta filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Arizona, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosemary Marquez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rosemary Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francis Saitta

Tucson, AZ 85719

Defendants

Arizona, State of

University of Arizona

Robert Robbins

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Francis Saitta. (7 pages)(JAM) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Francis Saitta. (5 pages) (JAM) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#3

(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-64-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (JAM) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he must pay the filing and administrative fees within 30 days. If Plaintiff fails to pay the fees within thirty days, the Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 2/23/22. (BAC) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Recuse 28 US Code 455 by Francis Saitta. (2 pages) (JAM) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION: Rule 60: Relief from a Judgment or Order by Francis Saitta. (MYE) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse (Doc. #6 ) and Rule 60 Motion (Doc. #7 ) are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing and administrative fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/30/22. (MYE) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed March 30, 2022, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. (MYE) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #8 Order, #9 Clerk's Judgment by Francis Saitta. (BAC) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#11

(#11) USCA Case Number re: #10 Notice of Appeal. Case number 22-15477, Ninth Circuit. (Distributed by the 9th Circuit) (BAC) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) USCA Case Number re: #10 Notice of Appeal. Case number 22-15477, Ninth Circuit. (Distributed by the 9th Circuit) (BAC) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #8 Order, #9 Clerk's Judgment by Francis Saitta. (BAC) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed March 30, 2022, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. (MYE) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse (Doc. #6 ) and Rule 60 Motion (Doc. #7 ) are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing and administrative fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/30/22. (MYE) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION: Rule 60: Relief from a Judgment or Order by Francis Saitta. (MYE) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Recuse 28 US Code 455 by Francis Saitta. (2 pages) (JAM) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he must pay the filing and administrative fees within 30 days. If Plaintiff fails to pay the fees within thirty days, the Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 2/23/22. (BAC) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (JAM) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-64-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Francis Saitta. (5 pages) (JAM) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Francis Saitta. (7 pages)(JAM) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Arizona is a litigant