Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 08:04:27 (UTC).

Saint Lawrence Communications LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Saint Lawrence Communications LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saint Lawrence Communications LLC

Defendants

Amazon.com LLC

Amazon.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amir H. Alavi

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Demetrios Anaipakos

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Justin Yee-Jin Chen

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Weining Bai

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC - Houston

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Brian Ervin Simmons

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Masood Anjom

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Alisa Anne Lipski

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Dean McBride

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Scott W Clark

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Alexander Killingsworth

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing PC - Houston

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/28/2019. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

19 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order

#19

(#19) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#18

(#18) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#17

(#17) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Alexander Killingsworth on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Killingsworth, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. Amazon.com LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

13 #1

Summons(es) Amazon.com, Inc.

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Anjom, Masood) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ervin Simmons on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Simmons, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement against Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7113093.), filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/28/2019. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com LLC to 4/4/2019; Amazon.com, Inc. to 4/4/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com LLC to 3/20/2019; Amazon.com, Inc. to 3/20/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Alexander Killingsworth on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Killingsworth, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. Amazon.com LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com LLC c/o Corporation Service Company, Amazon.com, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Amazon.com, Inc.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Weining Bai on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Bai, Weining) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alisa Anne Lipski on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Lipski, Alisa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott W Clark on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Clark, Scott) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Dean McBride on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (McBride, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Anjom, Masood) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ervin Simmons on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Simmons, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement against Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7113093.), filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Saint Lawrence Communications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith