This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 08:45:19 (UTC).

Saint Armand et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Saint Armand filed an Other lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory A. Presnell and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01985

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marie A. Saint Armand

Jonas Claudius

Defendants

Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Stoller

Attorney at Law Offices of David Stoller, PA

4445 S Conway Rd

Orlando, FL 32812-0073

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Summons Executed

#10

(#10) PROOF of service as to Secretary, Department of Homeland of Security by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

9 #1

Summons Executed

#9

(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 12/1/2021, answer due 1/31/2022; Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 12/1/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

8 #1

Summons Executed

#8

(#8) (incorrect PDF, refiled at #10) PROOF of service as to Secretary, Department of Homeland of Security by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit Summons Executed

#7

(#7) PROOF of service as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. (Stoller, David) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/29/2021. (DS) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (BD) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #12

Exhibit 1 I-130 Receipt

1 #11

Exhibit 8 How To read Processing Report

1 #8

Exhibit 5 Web Portal info Re I-485

1 #5

Exhibit 2 Web Portal information

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Cover Sheet

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF of service as to Secretary, Department of Homeland of Security by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 12/1/2021, answer due 1/31/2022; Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 12/1/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (incorrect PDF, refiled at #10) PROOF of service as to Secretary, Department of Homeland of Security by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF of service as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. (Stoller, David) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jonas Claudius, Marie A. Saint Armand. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/29/2021. (DS) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (BD) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-1985-GAP-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18963160) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit 2 Web Portal information, #6 Exhibit 3 notice of action re Form I-130, #8 Exhibit 5 Web Portal info Re I-485, #9 Exhibit 6 Notice of action re Form I-485, #10 Exhibit 7 Processing Report, #11 Exhibit 8 How To read Processing Report)(Stoller, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2021: #12 Exhibit 1 - I-130 Receipt, #13 Exhibit 4 - I-485 Receipt) (BD). Modified text on 11/24/2021 to remove duplicative text and to replace Exhibits 1 and 4 with redacted PDFs (BD). (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Stoller