This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 08:37:05 (UTC).

Sage v. Capital One Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Sage filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Capital One Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is M. Hannah Lauck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00609

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Hannah Lauck

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miles Sage

Defendant

Capital One Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susan Mary Rotkis

Attorney at Price Law Group, APC

382 S. Convent Ave.

Tuscon, AZ 85701

Defendant Attorney

John Darren Sadler

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP (DC)

1909 K Street Nw, 12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether all parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. To that end, counsel for the defendant shall ensure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than OCTOBER 6, 2020, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/22/20. (khan, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/22/20. (khan, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank, N.A.. (Sadler, John) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Capital One Bank, N.A..(Sadler, John) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miles Sage Capital One Bank, N.A. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020 (Rotkis, Susan) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank, N.A. **NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea,) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons as to Capital One Bank, N.A. by Miles Sage. (Rotkis, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-7342987), filed by Miles Sage. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rotkis, Susan). Modified docket text on 8/10/2020. (sbea,) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 12:30 PM in Richmond Remote before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (khan, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether all parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. To that end, counsel for the defendant shall ensure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than OCTOBER 6, 2020, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/22/20. (khan, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/22/20. (khan, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank, N.A.. (Sadler, John) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Capital One Bank, N.A..(Sadler, John) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miles Sage Capital One Bank, N.A. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020 (Rotkis, Susan) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank, N.A. **NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea,) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (sbea,) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons as to Capital One Bank, N.A. by Miles Sage. (Rotkis, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-7342987), filed by Miles Sage. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rotkis, Susan). Modified docket text on 8/10/2020. (sbea,) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less