This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/16/2022 at 06:40:03 (UTC).

Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc. v. Meta Platforms, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03896

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.

Defendant

Meta Platforms, Inc. d/b/a Facebook

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael C Guasco

Attorney at Buty & Curliano LLP

516 16Th Street, Oakland

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

Jacob Marcus Heath

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER re #25 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/2/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2022) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#24

(#24) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying #4 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS MOOT; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS UPDATE. Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION to Postpone Hearing for Fourteen Days filed by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2022 11:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2022 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/13/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION TO POSTPONE HEARING FOR FOURTEEN DAYS WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #18 , Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions, Util - Teleconference Zoom, to Further Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/12/2022) Modified on 7/13/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

4 #2

Proposed Order to Show Cause

4 #1

Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order

4 #4

Main Document

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit G to the Complaint

1 #7

Exhibit F to the Complaint

1 #6

Exhibit E to the Complaint

1 #5

Exhibit D to the Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B to the Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A to the Complaint

1 #1

Declaration of Dan Klein

1 #1

Main Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER re #25 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/2/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2022) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying #4 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS MOOT; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS UPDATE. Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION to Postpone Hearing for Fourteen Days filed by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2022 11:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2022 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/13/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION TO POSTPONE HEARING FOR FOURTEEN DAYS WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #18 , Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions, Util - Teleconference Zoom, to Further Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/12/2022) Modified on 7/13/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Certificate of Interested Entities by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 7/12/2022) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that one or more parties have not filed a Certification re Disclosure of Non-party Interested Entities or Persons required under Local Rule 3-15. Counsel shall do so forthwith. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2022) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/13/2022 01:30 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/13/2022 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/8/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2022) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Util - Teleconference Zoom, #4 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2022) Modified on 7/8/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. GUASCO RE: INABILITY TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #8 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines/Hearings , Util - Teleconference Zoom, re Inability to Serve Court's Order to Show Cause by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/1/2022) Modified on 7/5/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: #4 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2022. Reply due by 7/5/2022. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/6/2022 02:00 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/6/2022 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2022. Replies due by 7/5/2022.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/1/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. GUASCO re #4 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re Notification of Opposing Party by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/1/2022) Modified on 7/5/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#5) **PLEASE DISREGARD** Case assigned Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) Modified on 7/1/2022 (ark, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sage Marketing Advisors, Inc... (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and TRO against Meta Platforms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17316358.). Filed bySage Marketing Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dan Klein, #2 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to the Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to the Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to the Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to the Complaint, #7 Exhibit F to the Complaint, #8 Exhibit G to the Complaint, #9 Exhibit H to the Complaint, #10 Exhibit I to the Complaint, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guasco, Michael) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Marcus Heath