This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 11:30:24 (UTC).

Safety Specialty Insurance et al v. Genesee, County of et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Safety Specialty Insurance filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Genesee, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Tarnow, Curtis Ivy, Jr, Thomas L. Ludington and Patricia T. Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-13290

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Arthur J. Tarnow

Thomas L. Ludington

Referral Judges

Curtis Ivy, Jr

Patricia T. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Safety National Casualty Company

Safety Specialty Insurance

Defendants

Board of Commissione Genesee, County of

Tammy Puchlak

Deborah Cherry

Thomas A Fox

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam P. Sadowski

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp, LLP

211 West Fort Street, Suite 660

Detroit, MI 48226

Richard Rezie

Attorney at Gallagher, Sharp,

1501 Euclid Avenue, Sixth Floor

Cleveland, OH 44115

Defendant Attorney

Philip L. Ellison

Attorney at Outside Legal Counsel PLC

P.O. Box 107

Hemlock, MI 48626

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Thomas A Fox, Tammy Puchlak. (Ellison, Philip) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (NAhm) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Safety National Casualty Company waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021; Safety Specialty Insurance waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Sadowski, Adam) Modified on 1/15/2021 (SOso). [WAIVER EXECUTED ON Board of Commissione Genesee, County of]. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Ellison on behalf of Thomas A Fox, Tammy Puchlak. (Ellison, Philip) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Thomas A Fox waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021; Tammy Puchlak waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Ellison, Philip) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Deborah Cherry waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Sadowski, Adam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard Rezie appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rezie, Richard) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D - Policy No. GLA4052188

1 #3

Exhibit C - Policy No. POC4056122

1 #2

Exhibit B - Puchlak Class Action Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Fox First Amended Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Safety Specialty Insurance, Safety National Casualty Company against All Defendants. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8217835 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: N/A out of state - Missouri - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fox First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Puchlak Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Policy No. POC4056122, #4 Exhibit D - Policy No. GLA4052188) (Sadowski, Adam) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Thomas A Fox, Tammy Puchlak. (Ellison, Philip) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City. (NAhm) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Safety National Casualty Company waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021; Safety Specialty Insurance waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Sadowski, Adam) Modified on 1/15/2021 (SOso). [WAIVER EXECUTED ON Board of Commissione Genesee, County of]. (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Ellison on behalf of Thomas A Fox, Tammy Puchlak. (Ellison, Philip) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Thomas A Fox waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021; Tammy Puchlak waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Ellison, Philip) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Deborah Cherry waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Sadowski, Adam) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard Rezie appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rezie, Richard) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Safety Specialty Insurance, Safety National Casualty Company against All Defendants. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8217835 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: N/A out of state - Missouri - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fox First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Puchlak Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Policy No. POC4056122, #4 Exhibit D - Policy No. GLA4052188) (Sadowski, Adam) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safety National Casualty Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant