This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2022 at 07:24:51 (UTC).

Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois v. Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne R. Traum and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01133

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne R. Traum

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois

Defendant

Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew C Green

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Martin Keller

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois added. (Green, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (HAM) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/24/2022.(Keller, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Keller, Christopher) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#6

(#6) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois.. (Green, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Stipulation : Discovery due by 2/6/2023. Motions due by 3/8/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Stipulation : Discovery due by 2/6/2023. Motions due by 3/8/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois.. (Green, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Keller, Christopher) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/24/2022.(Keller, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (HAM) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois added. (Green, Andrew) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6975608) by Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois. Proof of service due by 10/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Green, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less