This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2023 at 07:52:32 (UTC).

Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois v. Henry Woodley et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Henry Woodley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred W. Slaughter and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-00301

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Defendants

Henry Woodley

R. A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mary E Gregory

Frank Falzetta

Scott R Sveslosky

Defendant Attorneys

Kim Loan Thi Dawley

Scott David Miller

Charles M Ray

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Henry Woodley, (Miller, Scott) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Henry Woodley.(Miller, Scott) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#18

(#18) Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant R. A.. (Ray, Charles) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

16 #1

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAIN

#16

(#16) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Henry Woodley answer now due 4/4/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Attorney Henry Woodley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3))(Attorney Scott David Miller added to party Henry Woodley(pty:dft))(Miller, Scott) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant R. A..(Attorney Charles M Ray added to party R. A.(pty:dft))(Ray, Charles) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. upon R. A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Charles Ray. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (and Plaintiffs' Certificate of Interested Parties or Entities) filed by Movant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant R. A..(Attorney Charles M Ray added to party R. A.(pty:dft))(Ray, Charles) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Henry Woodley, (Miller, Scott) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Henry Woodley.(Miller, Scott) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant R. A.. (Ray, Charles) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Henry Woodley answer now due 4/4/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Attorney Henry Woodley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3))(Attorney Scott David Miller added to party Henry Woodley(pty:dft))(Miller, Scott) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant R. A..(Attorney Charles M Ray added to party R. A.(pty:dft))(Ray, Charles) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. upon R. A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Charles Ray. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, upon Defendant Henry Woodley served on 2/28/2023, answer due 3/21/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Henry Woodley, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant R. A. (et) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Henry Woodley. (et) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (and Plaintiffs' Certificate of Interested Parties or Entities) filed by Movant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34827723 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Mary E Gregory added to party Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois(pty:bkmov))(Gregory, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less