This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:36:24 (UTC).

Safe-Guard Products International, LLC v. HH&S LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 Safe-Guard Products International, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against HH S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia L. Cohen and Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02628

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Patricia L. Cohen

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Safe-Guard Products International, LLC

Defendants

Chris Huddleston

HH&S LLC

Jason Seithel

Ryan Hoffmann

HH&S LLC a Missouri limited liability company doing business as Safeguard Auto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bridget G. Hoy

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

Michael Armstrong

Attorney at LEWIS RICE, LLC

600 Washington, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Safe-Guard Products International, LLC Ryan Hoffmann waiver signed on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Safe-Guard Products International, LLC Chris Huddleston waiver signed on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Safe-Guard Products International, LLC HH&S LLC waiver signed on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#9

(#9) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (MCB) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Armstrong for Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC. (Armstrong, Michael) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC.. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibits to Complaint) by Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

1 #19

Exhibit 13

1 #18

Exhibit 12

1 #17

Exhibit 11

1 #16

Exhibit 10

1 #15

Exhibit 9

1 #14

Exhibit 8

1 #13

Exhibit 7

1 #12

Exhibit 6

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7481203, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Safe-Guard Products International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons--HH&S LLC, #4 Summons--Chris Huddleston, #5 Summons--Jason Seithel, #6 Summons--Ryan Hoffmann, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13)(Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Safe-Guard Products International, LLC Ryan Hoffmann waiver signed on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Safe-Guard Products International, LLC Chris Huddleston waiver signed on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Safe-Guard Products International, LLC HH&S LLC waiver signed on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (MCB) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docket Text ORDER: RE #3 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibits to Complaint) by Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 9/30/19. (EAB) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#7) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Armstrong for Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC. (Armstrong, Michael) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Bridget G. Hoy. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC.. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SEALED DOCUMENT re #1 Complaint,, Exhibits 7 and 9 (unredacted) by Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Exhibits to Complaint) by Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC. (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Safe-Guard Products International, LLC Process Server: Robyn Hendricks (Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7481203, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Safe-Guard Products International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons--HH&S LLC, #4 Summons--Chris Huddleston, #5 Summons--Jason Seithel, #6 Summons--Ryan Hoffmann, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13)(Hoy, Bridget) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less