This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 15:08:57 (UTC).

SAFAR et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 SAFAR filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Julien Xavier Neals and James B. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05451

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julien Xavier Neals

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ENTESAR SAFAR

MAZHAR STAS

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

MERRICK GARLAND

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE

ANTONY BLINKEN

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

UR M. JADDOU

CHRISTOPHER WRAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JERARD A. GONZALEZ

Attorney at BASTARRIKA, SOTO, GONZALEZ & SOMOHANO LLP

3 Garret Mountain Plz, Ste 302

Woodland Park, NJ 07424-3352

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jan H. Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/4/2022. (sm) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice fee: $150.00, receipt number NEW047293 for Jan H. Brown. (ps) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jan H. Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/4/2022. (sm) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Order by ENTESAR SAFAR, MAZHAR STAS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (GONZALEZ, JERARD) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - A Proposed Order was not submitted with the #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice submitted by ENTESAR SAFAR, MAZHAR STAS on 9/8/2022. PLEASE SUBMIT THE MISSING DOCUMENT(S) ONLY using the event "Proposed Order" that can be found under Other Documents, and linking the entry to the #2 Motion. (ams, ) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANTONY BLINKEN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, MERRICK GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Enter Party Information as it appears in the Complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ams, ) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketJudge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ENTESAR SAFAR, MAZHAR STAS. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Declaration)(GONZALEZ, JERARD) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13676497), filed by MAZHAR STAS, ENTESAR SAFAR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GONZALEZ, JERARD) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Investigation is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerard A. Gonzalez Esq.