This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2020 at 11:20:53 (UTC).

Saenz et al v. Chevron U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Saenz filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Chevron U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald C. Griffin and David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ronald C. Griffin

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rene Saenz

Travis Collins

Defendants

Chevron U.S.A., Inc.

DXP Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua C. Borsellino

Attorney at Borsellino, P.C.

1020 Macon St., Suite 15

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly Frances Cheeseman

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Jesika J. Silva Blanco

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright U.S. LLP

1301 Mckinney St.,Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Kimberly R. Miers

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

100 Congress Ave., Suite 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Kelli C. Fuqua

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1400

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Exhibit 1 - FLSA Consent of Mike Miranda

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Filing FLSA Consent of Mike Miranda by Travis Collins, Rene Saenz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FLSA Consent of Mike Miranda)(Borsellino, Joshua) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#14

(#14) Scheduling Recommendations by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Certify Class and Provide Notice Per 29 U.S.C. 216 by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

12 #1

Appendix

#12

(#12) MOTION to Certify Class and Provide Notice Per 29 U.S.C. 216 by Travis Collins, Rene Saenz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Borsellino, Joshua) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesika J. Silva Blanco on behalf of Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (Silva Blanco, Jesika) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Frances Cheeseman on behalf of Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (Cheeseman, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#9

(#9) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Chevron U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft) by Chevron U.S.A., Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#7

(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DXP Enterprises, Inc.. (Miers, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Kimberly R. Miers added to party DXP Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft) by DXP Enterprises, Inc..(Miers, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - FLSA Consent of Travis Collins

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - FLSA Consent of Rene Saenz

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13735116), filed by Rene Saenz, Travis Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FLSA Consent of Rene Saenz, #2 Exhibit 2 - FLSA Consent of Travis Collins, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borsellino, Joshua) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Filing FLSA Consent of Mike Miranda by Travis Collins, Rene Saenz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FLSA Consent of Mike Miranda)(Borsellino, Joshua) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Scheduling Recommendations by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED the Defendant has until September 17, 2020, to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs (Doc. 12). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Certify Class and Provide Notice Per 29 U.S.C. 216 by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Certify Class and Provide Notice Per 29 U.S.C. 216 by Travis Collins, Rene Saenz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Borsellino, Joshua) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesika J. Silva Blanco on behalf of Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (Silva Blanco, Jesika) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Frances Cheeseman on behalf of Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (Cheeseman, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Chevron U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft) by Chevron U.S.A., Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DXP Enterprises, Inc.. (Miers, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Kimberly R. Miers added to party DXP Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft) by DXP Enterprises, Inc..(Miers, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (se) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to DXP Enterprises, Inc.. (se) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (se) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Travis Collins, Rene Saenz. (Borsellino, Joshua) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13735116), filed by Rene Saenz, Travis Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FLSA Consent of Rene Saenz, #2 Exhibit 2 - FLSA Consent of Travis Collins, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borsellino, Joshua) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DXP Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelli Caitlin Fuqua

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Carter Crow