This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 09:33:05 (UTC).

Sadowski v. The Range Broadcasting, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Sadowski filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Range Broadcasting, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephan M. Vidmar and Carmen E. Garza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01253

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

Presiding Judge

Carmen E. Garza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI

Defendants

THE RANGE BROADCASTING, LLC

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

FNU Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Naomi Manea Sarega

Attorney at HIgbee & Associates

1504 Brookhollow Dr. #112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Sadowski. The Range Broadcasting, LLC served on 12/26/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Sarega, Naomi) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#4

(#4) Report re:copyright (dr) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

2 #2

AO-121

2 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI of Interested Parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 AO-121) (Sarega, Naomi) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-D

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, THE RANGE BROADCASTING, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarega, Naomi) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Sadowski. The Range Broadcasting, LLC served on 12/26/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Sarega, Naomi) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to The Range Broadcasting, LLC. (dr) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report re:copyright (dr) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI of Interested Parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 AO-121) (Sarega, Naomi) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7434319 re #1 Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sarega, Naomi) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, THE RANGE BROADCASTING, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CHRISTOPHER SADOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarega, Naomi) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Naomi Manea Sarega