This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:34:42 (UTC).

Sacriste v. FedNat Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Sacriste filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FedNat Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fred Biery. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01163

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred Biery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Sacriste

Defendant

FedNat Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine Cora Hairfield

Attorney at The Hodge Firm, PLLC

2211 The Strand, Suite 302

Galveston, TX 77550

Shaun W. Hodge

Attorney at Hodge Law Firm, PLLC

1301 Market Streetthe Historic Runge House

Galveston, TX 77550

Racchel D. Cabrera

Attorney at Hodge Law Firm, PLLC

2211 The Strand, Suite 302

Galveston, TX 77550

Defendant Attorneys

James B. Kauffman

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith

1301 Mckinney, Ste. 1400

Houston, TX 77010

Leslie Dean Pickett

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr & Smith

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedNat Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15465797), filed by FedNat Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2)(Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D-1

1 #5

Exhibit D-2

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by FedNat Insurance Company. (Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Atty: Jahan Guram. (wg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter forwarded to Atty: Racchel D. Cabrera. (wg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shaun W. Hodge for Racchel D. Cabrera ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15470858) by on behalf of Adam Sacriste. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Racchel D. Cabrera for Adam Sacriste. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Racchel D. Cabrera for Adam Sacriste. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shaun W. Hodge for Racchel D. Cabrera ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15470858) by on behalf of Adam Sacriste. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter forwarded to Atty: Racchel D. Cabrera. (wg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Atty: Jahan Guram. (wg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by FedNat Insurance Company. (Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedNat Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15465797), filed by FedNat Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2)(Kauffman, James) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDNAT Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James (Jake) B Kauffman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie Dean Pickett