This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 11:07:04 (UTC).

Sacco v. Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Sacco filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02330

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Sacco

Defendants

Mouseflow, Inc.

Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Dashiell Smith

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Blvd., Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

Ana Tagvoryan

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Julianna Simon

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Harrison Maxwell Brown

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeffrey S. Jacobson, PHV

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas, 41St Floor

New York, NY 10036

Cindy C. Unegbu

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/25/2020 EXTENDING to 2/12/2021, the deadline for which defendants Blizzard and Mouseflow have to respond to the complaint. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#15

(#15) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/30/2020 ORDERING attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson, PHV, added for Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#13

(#13) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. for attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9316674) (Unegbu, Cindy) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Setting Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Attorney Unegbu, Cindy C. added. (Unegbu, Cindy) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julianna Simon on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Simon, Julianna added. (Simon, Julianna) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Harrison Maxwell Brown on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Brown, Harrison Maxwell added. (Brown, Harrison) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Ana) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to Respond to #1 Complaint by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Ana) Modified on 12/16/2020 (Tupolo, A). (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ana Tagvoryan on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Tagvoryan, Ana added. (Tagvoryan, Ana) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint By No More Than Twenty-Eight Days by Brian Sacco. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mouseflow, Inc. served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Mouseflow, Inc. by Brian Sacco. Attorney Smith, Joel Dashiell added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9259552) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/30/2020 ORDERING attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson, PHV, added for Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/25/2020 EXTENDING to 2/12/2021, the deadline for which defendants Blizzard and Mouseflow have to respond to the complaint. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. for attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9316674) (Unegbu, Cindy) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Setting Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Attorney Unegbu, Cindy C. added. (Unegbu, Cindy) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julianna Simon on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Simon, Julianna added. (Simon, Julianna) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Harrison Maxwell Brown on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Brown, Harrison Maxwell added. (Brown, Harrison) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Ana) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to Respond to #1 Complaint by Mouseflow, Inc.. (Tagvoryan, Ana) Modified on 12/16/2020 (Tupolo, A). (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ana Tagvoryan on behalf of Mouseflow, Inc.. Attorney Tagvoryan, Ana added. (Tagvoryan, Ana) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint By No More Than Twenty-Eight Days by Brian Sacco. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mouseflow, Inc. served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Mouseflow, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel Dashiell Smith* *Bursor & Fisher, P.A.* *1990 North California Blvd., Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Mouseflow, Inc. by Brian Sacco. Attorney Smith, Joel Dashiell added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9259552) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mouseflow, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Blizzard Entertainment Inc is a litigant