This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2020 at 07:59:29 (UTC).

Sabran et al v. Rockhill Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 Sabran filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rockhill Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00803

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ira Sabran a/a/o 2203 Regal Way LLC

Barbara Sabran a/a/o 2203 Regal Way LLC

Barbara Sabran

Ira Sabran

Defendant

Rockhill Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles P. Pearson

Attorney at Shelton Law, PLLC

2073 Summit Lake Drive., Suite 151

Tallahassee, FL 32317

Jeffery Remington Huggins

Attorney at Shelton Law, PLLC

2073 Summit Lake Drive., Suite 151

Tallahassee, FL 32317

Dale Scott Shelton

Attorney at Shelton Law, PLLC

2073 Summit Lake Dr.

Tallahassee, FL 32317-7949

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Packer

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, P.C.

Suite 1100, 2400 East Commercial Boulevard

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33308

Danielle N. Robinson

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

Suite 1100, 2400 East Commercial Boulevard

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33308

Irene Thaler

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey

100 Ne 3Rd Avenue., Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) NOTICE of pendency of related cases Joint Notice of Pendency of Related Cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rockhill Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Rockhill Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Auto Insurance Companies, Corporate Parent State Auto Group, Corporate Parent shelton law for Rockhill Insurance Company.. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#18

(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 2/10/2021, Discovery due by 4/1/2022, Dispositive motions due by 5/4/2022, Pretrial statement due by 8/12/2022, All other motions due by 8/12/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2022, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti, Trial term commencing 9/1/2022 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti., Conduct mediation hearing by 4/15/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/9/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#17

(#17) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/9/2020 granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Related Cases and Corporate Disclosure Statement. The Court sets a deadline of 12/10/2020 to file the missing documents. (Digital) (jmc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#15

(#15) PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 filed by Barbara Sabran, Ira Sabran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Pearson, Charles) Modified on 12/9/2020 to edit docket text (drn). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Rockhill Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Auto Insurance Companies, Corporate Parent State Auto Group, Corporate Parent shelton law for Rockhill Insurance Company.. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

1 #9

State Court Other Documents State - Filing Fee Receipt

1 #8

State Court Other Documents State - Standing Order

1 #7

State Court COMPLAINT State - Complaint

1 #6

State Court Other Documents State - Summons

1 #5

State Court Other Documents State - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

State Court Docket Sheet State - Docket

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - NOS Process

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit in and for Colllier County, Florida, case number 11-2020-CA-002931-0001-XX filed in State Court on 09/09/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17415088 filed by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - NOS Process, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Docket Sheet State - Docket, #5 State Court Other Documents State - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 State Court Other Documents State - Summons, #7 State Court COMPLAINT State - Complaint, #8 State Court Other Documents State - Standing Order, #9 State Court Other Documents State - Filing Fee Receipt, #10 State Court Other Documents State - NOS Process, #11 State Court Other Documents State - NOA, #12 State Court Other Documents State - Deft's MET Resp Complaint)(Packer, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of pendency of related cases Joint Notice of Pendency of Related Cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rockhill Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Rockhill Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Rockhill Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Auto Insurance Companies, Corporate Parent State Auto Group, Corporate Parent shelton law for Rockhill Insurance Company.. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 2/10/2021, Discovery due by 4/1/2022, Dispositive motions due by 5/4/2022, Pretrial statement due by 8/12/2022, All other motions due by 8/12/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2022, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti, Trial term commencing 9/1/2022 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti., Conduct mediation hearing by 4/15/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/9/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/9/2020 granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Related Cases and Corporate Disclosure Statement. The Court sets a deadline of 12/10/2020 to file the missing documents. (Digital) (jmc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket(#16) Joint ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Related Cases and Corporate Disclosure Statement by all Parties. (jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 filed by Barbara Sabran, Ira Sabran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Pearson, Charles) Modified on 12/9/2020 to edit docket text (drn). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of change of address by Irene Thaler (Thaler, Irene) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of change of address by Charles P. Pearson (Pearson, Charles) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/19/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Governing Telephonic Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/19/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 11/30/2020. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER denying as moot #4 Defendant, Rockhill Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint because the motion was filed before the case was removed to this Court and because Defendant filed a motion to dismiss on 10/14/2020 (see Doc. #6), which was well within the timeframes specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/14/2020. (McCoy, Mac) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re #3 Complaint by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thaler, Irene) Modified on 12/9/2020 to convert to motion (drn). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/14/2020. (WRW) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint by Rockhill Insurance Company. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Rockhill Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Ira Sabran a/a/o 2203 Regal Way LLC, Barbara Sabran a/a/o 2203 Regal Way LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(RMT) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-803-FtM-66MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit in and for Colllier County, Florida, case number 11-2020-CA-002931-0001-XX filed in State Court on 09/09/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17415088 filed by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - NOS Process, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Docket Sheet State - Docket, #5 State Court Other Documents State - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 State Court Other Documents State - Summons, #7 State Court COMPLAINT State - Complaint, #8 State Court Other Documents State - Standing Order, #9 State Court Other Documents State - Filing Fee Receipt, #10 State Court Other Documents State - NOS Process, #11 State Court Other Documents State - NOA, #12 State Court Other Documents State - Deft's MET Resp Complaint)(Packer, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dale Scott Shelton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Remington Huggins