This case was last updated from PACER on 07/02/2019 at 12:04:54 (UTC).

SABOL v. ALLSTEEL INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 SABOL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALLSTEEL INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01926

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDMUND SABOL

Defendants

ALLSTEEL INC.

HNI CORPORATION

THE HON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN D. RUBINSTEIN

Attorney at COHEN PLACITELLA & ROTH

2001 Market St 29Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER ANNE MCGARRITY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC

1717 Arch Street, Suite 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/24/2019 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 6/19/19. 6/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THIS ACTION PE3NDING IN MDL 875 TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by HNI CORPORATION.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by THE HON COMPANY.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by ALLSTEEL INC..(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATON AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNTIL MAY 20, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 05/13/2019. 05/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION for extension of time by ALLSTEEL INC., HNI CORPORATION, THE HON COMPANY. (MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HNI CORPORATION.(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HNI CORPORATION for THE HON COMPANY with Certificate of Service by THE HON COMPANY.(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HNI CORPORATION for ALLSTEEL INC. with Certificate of Service by ALLSTEEL INC..(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

1 #5

Case Management Track

1 #4

Designation Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal filed by ALLSTEEL INC., HNI CORPORATION and THE HON COMPANY from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190402116. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE196717), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track)(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/24/2019 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER ON 6/19/19. 6/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER THAT THE COURT REFERS THIS ACTION PE3NDING IN MDL 875 TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR PROCEEDINGS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by HNI CORPORATION.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by THE HON COMPANY.(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by ALLSTEEL INC..(MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATON AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNTIL MAY 20, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 05/13/2019. 05/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION for extension of time by ALLSTEEL INC., HNI CORPORATION, THE HON COMPANY. (MCGARRITY, JENNIFER) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by HNI CORPORATION.(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HNI CORPORATION for THE HON COMPANY with Certificate of Service by THE HON COMPANY.(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent HNI CORPORATION for ALLSTEEL INC. with Certificate of Service by ALLSTEEL INC..(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal filed by ALLSTEEL INC., HNI CORPORATION and THE HON COMPANY from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190402116. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE196717), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Designation Form, #5 Case Management Track)(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less