This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2020 at 07:18:14 (UTC).

Sabine v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Sabine filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa A. Jensen and Iain D. Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-50415

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisa A. Jensen

Presiding Judge

Iain D. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Sabine

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tracy Lynn Jones

Attorney at Black & Jones Attorneys at Law

308 W. State Street, Suite 300

Rockford, IL 61101

Stephanie Renee Seibold

Attorney at Black & Jones Attorneys at Law

308 W. State Street, Suite 300

Rockford, IL 61101

Defendant Attorneys

AUSA-SSA

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Monica V Mallory

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

327 South Church Street, Suite 3300

Rockford, IL 61101

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file the administrative record #8 is agreed and granted. Defendant shall file the administrative record by 2/26/2021. Mailed notice (jp, ) (Entered: 12/19/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file the administrative record #8 is agreed and granted. Defendant shall file the administrative record by 2/26/2021. Mailed notice (jp, ) (Entered: 12/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Mallory, Monica) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Parties consent to exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge. This case is transferred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 10/30/2020. (jp, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Seibold, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DESIGNATION of Monica V Mallory as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Mallory, Monica) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Sabine by Stephanie Renee Seibold (Seibold, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Sabine by Tracy Lynn Jones (Jones, Tracy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jones, Tracy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lisa Sabine; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17586235.(Jones, Tracy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less