This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 08:15:03 (UTC).

Sabby v. Ward et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Sabby filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Ward. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Catherine M. Salinas and J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02410

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Catherine M. Salinas

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

David Randy Sabby

Respondents

Wheeler Correctional Facility

Timothy C. Ward

Attorney General State of Georgia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert L. Sirianni, Jr.

Attorney at Brownstone, PA

P.O. Box 2047

Winter Park, FL 32790

Respondent Attorneys

Clint Christopher Malcolm

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

10 #20

Exhibit Exhibit 10 a copy of the amended sentence in Douglas County entered on A

10 #19

Exhibit Exhibit 9 a copy of the trial courts order adjudicating the motion to v

10 #18

Exhibit Exhibit 8 a copy of Petitioners motion to vacate a void sentence filed

10 #17

Exhibit Exhibit 7 a copy of the state habeas hearing transcript from January 25

10 #16

Exhibit Exhibit 6(k) a copy of volume XI of XI of the state habeas hearing tran

10 #15

Exhibit Exhibit 6(j) a copy of volume X of XI of the state habeas hearing trans

10 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of volume VII of XI of the state habeas hearing tra

10 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 6(f) a copy of volume VI of XI of the state habeas hearing tran

10 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 6(e) a copy of volume V of XI of the state habeas hearing trans

10 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 6(d) a copy of volume IV of XI of the state habeas hearing tran

10 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 6(c) a copy of volume III of XI of the state habeas hearing tra

10 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 6(b) a copy of volume II of XI of the state habeas hearing tran

10 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6(a) a copy of volume I of XI of the state habeas hearing trans

10 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5 a copy of the state habeas hearing transcript from July 20, 2

10 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts denial of Petitioners mo

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts denial of Petitioners ap

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 a copy of Petitioners state habeas corpus petition.

#5

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of the #5 Order to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (aaq) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Of Filing by Timothy C. Ward (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 a copy of Petitioners state habeas corpus petition., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 a copy of the state habeas courts final order denying relief., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts denial of Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts denial of Petitioners motion for reconsideration of his application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 a copy of the state habeas hearing transcript from July 20, 2016., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6(a) a copy of volume I of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6(b) a copy of volume II of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6(c) a copy of volume III of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6(d) a copy of volume IV of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6(e) a copy of volume V of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #11 Exhibit Exhibit 6(f) a copy of volume VI of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #12 Exhibit Exhibit 6(g) a copy of volume VII of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #13 Exhibit Exhibit 6(h) a copy of volume VIII of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #14 Exhibit Exhibit 6(i) a copy of volume IX of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #15 Exhibit Exhibit 6(j) a copy of volume X of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #16 Exhibit Exhibit 6(k) a copy of volume XI of XI of the state habeas hearing transcript from September 21, 2016., #17 Exhibit Exhibit 7 a copy of the state habeas hearing transcript from January 25, 2017., #18 Exhibit Exhibit 8 a copy of Petitioners motion to vacate a void sentence filed in Douglas County., #19 Exhibit Exhibit 9 a copy of the trial courts order adjudicating the motion to vacate a void sentence., #20 Exhibit Exhibit 10 a copy of the amended sentence in Douglas County entered on April 19, 2021.)(Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Answer- RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Timothy C. Ward. (Attachments: #1 Brief IN SUPPORT OF ANSWER-RESPONSE)(Malcolm, Clint) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified to edit text on 7/27/2021 (ceo). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Timothy C. Ward (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Timothy C. Ward (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Robert L. Sirianni, Jr.. Clerk to follow-up by 7/6/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Randy Sabby, Timothy C. Ward (CMRR 91 7199 9991 7032 5718 5031), Christopher M. Carr (91 7199 9991 7032 5024) re #5 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition. #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus also mailed to Timothy C. Ward, Christopher M. Carr. (tcc) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 30 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Petitioner is DIRECTED that, if he wishes to file a reply to Respondent's response, he must file his reply within twenty (20) days of receipt of Respondent's response. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED TO RESUBMIT this action to the assigned Magistrate Judge within twenty days of Respondent filing a response or, if Respondent fails to file a response, at the expiration of the time for doing so. Petitioner has named three respondents, including Timothy C. Ward (who is the proper respondent), and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove as respondents the Wheeler Correctional Facility and the Attorney General of the State of Georgia, as they are unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 6/22/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by David Randy Sabby. (rjc) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Document Filed Correctly at Doc. #4 NOTICE by David Randy Sabby Consent to Magistrate Judge (Sirianni, Robert) Modified on 6/21/2021 (rjc). (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Of Filing efiling USDC and NextGen PACER glitch by David Randy Sabby (Sirianni, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AGANDC-11035314.) filed by David Randy Sabby. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wheeler Correctional Facility is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith