This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2020 at 07:57:54 (UTC).

Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC v. Alpha International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alpha International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Janet T. Neff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00283

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC

Defendants

J.K. Properties, LLC

Alpha International, Inc.

J.K. Manufacturing Co.

J. Lloyd International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott R. Knapp

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC (Grand Rapids)

215 S Washington Sq., Ste. 200

Lansing, MI 48933-1816

Samantha Anne Pattwell

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC (Grand Rapids)

215 S Washington Sq., Ste. 200

Lansing, MI 48933-1816

Daniel F. Gosch

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC (Grand Rapids)

200 Ottawa Ave., Nw, Ste. 1000

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Defendant Attorney

David E. Bevins

Attorney at Rhoades McKee P.C.

300 Riverfront Plaza Bldg., 55 Campau Ave., Nw

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Fourth Amending Court's Notice of Hearing by plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#28

(#28) NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding document number #7 : reply due by 5/22/2020; motion hearing rescheduled to 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; counsel must comply with the directives set forth in this Notice; (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#27

(#27) ORDER granting to an extent stipulated proposed order #26 ; notice to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#26

(#26) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Third Amending Court's Notice of Hearing by plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#25

(#25) NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding document number #7 : reply due by 5/15/2020; motion hearing rescheduled to 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; counsel must comply with the directives set forth in this Notice; (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

7 #3

Exhibit 2

7 #2

Exhibit 1

7 #1

Index

#7

(#20) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to appoint receiver #7 filed by Alpha International, Inc., J. Lloyd International, Inc., J.K. Manufacturing Co., J.K. Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Bevins, David) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

1 #17

Exhibit G

1 #16

Exhibit F-3

1 #14

Exhibit F-1

1 #8

Exhibit C-2

1 #4

Exhibit A-3

1 #3

Exhibit A-2

1 #2

Exhibit A-1

1 #1

Index Index of Exhibits

#1

(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Fourth Amending Court's Notice of Hearing by plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding document number #7 : reply due by 5/22/2020; motion hearing rescheduled to 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; counsel must comply with the directives set forth in this Notice; (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting to an extent stipulated proposed order #26 ; notice to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Third Amending Court's Notice of Hearing by plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding document number #7 : reply due by 5/15/2020; motion hearing rescheduled to 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; counsel must comply with the directives set forth in this Notice; (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #23 ; notice to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Amending The Court's Notice of Hearing by plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #21 ; extending certain deadlines set forth in the notice of hearing; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Amending Court's Notice of Hearing by plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to appoint receiver #7 filed by Alpha International, Inc., J. Lloyd International, Inc., J.K. Manufacturing Co., J.K. Properties, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Bevins, David) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Alpha International, Inc., J. Lloyd International, Inc., J.K. Manufacturing Co., J.K. Properties, LLC (mlc) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to attorney Scott R. Knapp regarding recent filing #1 (mlc) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Alpha International, Inc., J. Lloyd International, Inc., J.K. Manufacturing Co., J.K. Properties, LLC (Summons Not Provided) (mlc) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mlc) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel F. Gosch on behalf of plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Gosch, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Samantha Anne Pattwell on behalf of plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Pattwell, Samantha) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5070650 (Knapp, Scott) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sabal Palm Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit B-2, #7 Exhibit C-1, #8 Exhibit C-2, #9 Exhibit C-3, #10 Exhibit C-4, #11 Exhibit C-5, #12 Exhibit D-1, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F-1, #15 Exhibit F-2, #16 Exhibit F-3, #17 Exhibit G) (Knapp, Scott) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.K. PROPERTIES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Anne Pattwell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R. Knapp