1:22-CV-03799
12/22/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Other - Administrative Procedure Act
Christopher R. Cooper
FERAS SAAD ALDIN
NOUR FAYOUMI
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
UR M. JADDOU
Washington, DC 20001
TED H. KIM
HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE
MATTHEW D. EMRICH
CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY
IRVIN GADSON
Lewis G. Jubran
Attorney at ABUSHARAR & ASSOCIATES
501 N Brookhurst Street, Suite 202
Anaheim, CA 92801
(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/9/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/10/2023. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IRVIN GADSON served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/9/23. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
Notice and Consent
(#2) SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
Summons
Summons
Summons
Summons
Main Document
Docket(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/9/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/10/2023. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IRVIN GADSON served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/9/2023 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/9/23. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/16/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zljn) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9751022) filed by NOUR FAYOUMI, FERAS SAAD ALDIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
[-] Read Less