This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:36:52 (UTC).

S.A. v. New York City Department Of Education

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 S A filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against New York City Department Of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00160

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S.A.

S.J.

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

New York City Department Of Education,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrea Spratt

Attorney at The Law Office of Andrea Spratt, Esq.

110 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Lynn Harrington, I

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church St.

New York, NY 10007

Martin John Bowe, Jr

Attorney at NYC Law Department

100 Church Street Room 3-212

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25556486)Document filed by S.A., S.J...(Spratt, Andrea) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spratt, Andrea) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by S.A., S.A...(Spratt, Andrea) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,. (vf) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#5

(#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Mart Bowe dated 01/28/2022. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Bowe, Martin) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lynn Harrington, I on behalf of New York City Department Of Education,..(Harrington, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Mart Bowe dated 01/28/2022.. Application granted. SO ORDERED. New York City Department Of Education, answer due 4/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/31/2022) (ate) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department Of Education, served on 1/13/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. Service was accepted by Linda Lawyer, Docketing Clerk. Document filed by S.A.; S.A...(Spratt, Andrea) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department Of Education, served on 1/13/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. Service was accepted by Linda Lawyer, Docketing Clerk. Document filed by S.A.; S.A...(Spratt, Andrea) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Mart Bowe dated 01/28/2022.. Application granted. SO ORDERED. New York City Department Of Education, answer due 4/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/31/2022) (ate) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lynn Harrington, I on behalf of New York City Department Of Education,..(Harrington, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Mart Bowe dated 01/28/2022. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Bowe, Martin) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,. (vf) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by S.A., S.A...(Spratt, Andrea) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrea Spratt. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $15,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to Kings;. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrea Spratt. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, S.A., S.J.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spratt, Andrea) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25556486)Document filed by S.A., S.J...(Spratt, Andrea) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.J. is a litigant

Latest cases where S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where New York City Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin John Bowe