This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2023 at 08:30:23 (UTC).

S3G Technology LLC v. The Buckle, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 S3G Technology LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Buckle, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S3G Technology LLC

Defendant

The Buckle, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Ainsworth

Defendant Attorneys

Theodore Druce Kwong

Jon Bentley Hyland

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 3/21/2023. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/2/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2023. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/1/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by S3G Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Buckle, Inc. (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

9 #8

Exhibit 7

9 #7

Exhibit 6

9 #6

Exhibit 5

9 #5

Exhibit 4

9 #4

Exhibit 3

9 #3

Exhibit 2

9 #2

Exhibit 1

9 #1

Exhibit Declaration

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by The Buckle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Kwong, Theodore) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Druce Kwong on behalf of The Buckle, Inc. (Kwong, Theodore) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Buckle, Inc..( Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Bentley Hyland on behalf of The Buckle, Inc. (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by S3G Technology LLC. The Buckle, Inc. served on 1/6/2023, answer due 1/27/2023. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 3/21/2023. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/2/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2023. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/1/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by S3G Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Buckle, Inc. (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) by The Buckle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Kwong, Theodore) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Druce Kwong on behalf of The Buckle, Inc. (Kwong, Theodore) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Buckle, Inc. to 2/27/2023. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Buckle, Inc..( Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Bentley Hyland on behalf of The Buckle, Inc. (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by S3G Technology LLC. The Buckle, Inc. served on 1/6/2023, answer due 1/27/2023. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to The Buckle, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by S3G Technology LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against The Buckle, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9294397.), filed by S3G Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less