Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2021 at 08:22:31 (UTC).

S3G Technology LLC v. Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC

Case Summary

On 11/27/2020 S3G Technology LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01090

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S3G Technology LLC

Defendant

Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles L. Ainsworth

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Suite 418

Tyler, TX 75702

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Ste. 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Marie Stafki

Attorney at Pirkey Barber PLLC

1801 East 6Th Street, Suite 300

Austin, TX 78702

Travis R. Wimberly

Attorney at Pirkey Barber PLLC

1801 East 6Th Street, Suite 300

Austin, TX 78702

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wimberly, Travis) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis R. Wimberly on behalf of Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. Attorney Travis R. Wimberly added to party Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC(pty:dft) (Wimberly, Travis) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wimberly, Travis) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by S3G Technology LLC. Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. (lad) (Entered: 11/28/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by S3G Technology LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by S3G Technology LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14225625). No Summons requested at this time, filed by S3G Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/28/2020) (lad). (Entered: 11/27/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketColdwell Banker Real Estate LLC answer due 2/4/2021. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Having considered Defendant Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLCs Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, the Court concludes that the motion should be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint is extended until and including February 4, 2021.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wimberly, Travis) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC answer due 1/20/2021. (am) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Having considered Defendant Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLCs Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, the Court concludes that the motion should be GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint is extended until and including January 20, 2021.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis R. Wimberly on behalf of Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. Attorney Travis R. Wimberly added to party Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC(pty:dft) (Wimberly, Travis) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wimberly, Travis) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by S3G Technology LLC. Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. (lad) (Entered: 11/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 11/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by S3G Technology LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by S3G Technology LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14225625). No Summons requested at this time, filed by S3G Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/28/2020) (lad). (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis R. Wimberly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Marie Stafki