This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:48:12 (UTC).

S. et al v. United Healthcare Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 S filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00295

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

D. S.

C. S.

Defendants

United Healthcare Insurance

United Behavioral Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorney

Rebecca R. Hanson

Attorney at REED SMITH

10 S Wacker Dr 40Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiffs C. S., D. S. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/2/22. (alf) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by D. S., C. S. as to United Healthcare Insurance Waiver sent on 6/21/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by D. S., C. S. as to United Behavioral Health Waiver sent on 6/21/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs C. S., D. S., Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. Form due by 7/7/2022. (alf) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket(#7) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. (alf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs C. S., D. S., Defendants United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance. Form due by 7/7/2022. (alf) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by D. S., C. S. as to United Behavioral Health Waiver sent on 6/21/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by D. S., C. S. as to United Healthcare Insurance Waiver sent on 6/21/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/2/22. (alf) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4321318) filed by D. S., C. S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiffs C. S., D. S. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca R. Hanson