This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 07:45:51 (UTC).

S. et al v. New Haven et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 S filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against New Haven. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00745

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M. S.

N. S.

Defendants

Byron Kennedy

Toni Harp

City of New Haven

Paul Kowalski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy D. Marx

Attorney at New Haven Legal Assistance Assoc. Inc.

426 State Street

New Haven, CT 06510-2018

Defendant Attorney

Andrew A. Cohen

Attorney at Winnick Ruben, Hoffnung, Peabody & Mendel, LLC

110 Whitney Ave.

New Haven, CT 06510

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Attachment to Notice of Removal

1 #2

Appendix Notice of Pending Motions

1 #3

Appendix Statement of Removed Case

#2

#3

3 #1

Pending Applications in State Court

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Marx, Amy) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION Waive Bond filed by M. S., N. S., #3 Notice (Other), filed by Paul Kowalski, Toni Harp, City of New Haven, Byron Kennedy, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Paul Kowalski, Toni Harp, City of New Haven, Byron Kennedy, #7 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Paul Kowalski, Toni Harp, City of New Haven, Byron Kennedy. Signed by Clerk on 05/16/19. (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/16/19. (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/16/19. (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019, Discovery due by 11/15/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/16/19. (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Waive Bond by M. S., N. S..Responses due by 6/6/2019. Pending in state court at time of removal. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of No Pending Motions but disclosing pending application for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Waive Bond filed by plaintiffs in state court by Toni Harp, Byron Kennedy, Paul Kowalski, City of New Haven (Attachments: #1 Pending Applications in State Court)(Walker, J.) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT RE: REMOVED CASE by Toni Harp, Byron Kennedy, Paul Kowalski, City of New Haven (Walker, J.) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paul Kowalski, Toni Harp, City of New Haven, Byron Kennedy from Connecticut Superior Court, case number NHH-CV19-5003845-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5282506, filed by Paul Kowalski, Toni Harp, City of New Haven, Byron Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Notice of Removal, #2 Appendix Notice of Pending Motions, #3 Appendix Statement of Removed Case)(Cohen, Andrew) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less