This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2020 at 13:22:44 (UTC).

Rynn v. First Transit Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Rynn filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against First Transit Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01309

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Rynn

Maricopa, AZ 85139

Defendants

Unknown Parties

First Transit Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Shawn Oller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

Kimberly Marie Shappley

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/9/2021. (See attached Order for additional details and deadlines). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/27/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by First Transit Incorporated. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by First Transit Incorporated. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION of Suggestion of Recusal by Richard Rynn. (DXD) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/10/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Transit Incorporated. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#6

(#6) Defendant First Transit, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by First Transit Incorporated.(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/2/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to First Transit Incorporated. (REK) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

1 #7

Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-093419. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18436194 filed by First Transit Incorporated. (submitted by Robert Oller) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Dispositive motions due by 4/9/2021. (See attached Order for additional details and deadlines). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/27/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Scheduling Conference held on 8/27/2020. Deadlines discussed and entered. Scheduling Order to follow. IT IS ORDERED denying Motion to Suggestion of Recusal (Doc. #9 ). APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Richard Rynn for Pro Se Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Kimberly Shappley for Defendants. (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) Hearing held 9:29 AM to 9:53 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by First Transit Incorporated. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by First Transit Incorporated. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION of Suggestion of Recusal by Richard Rynn. (DXD) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/10/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Transit Incorporated. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant First Transit, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by First Transit Incorporated.(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/2/2020. (JAMA) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to First Transit Incorporated. (REK) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18436194. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01309-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docket***State Court record received on 6/09/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Richard Rynn: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for a Jury Trial, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon First Transit Incorporated on 6/02/2020.***Affidavit of Service filed in State Court on 6/09/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/01/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-093419. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18436194 filed by First Transit Incorporated. (submitted by Robert Oller) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST TRANSIT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Marie Shappley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Shawn Oller