This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2023 at 07:15:50 (UTC).

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. v. Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Ryder Truck Rental, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Kathleen L. DeSoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Kathleen L. DeSoto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Defendant

Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick C. Riley

Attorney at Tarlow Stonecipher Weamer & Kelly, PLLC

1705 West College

Bozeman, MT 59715

Nicholas R VandenBos

Attorney at Tarlow Stonecipher Weamer & Kelly, PLLC

1705 W. College Street

Bozeman, MT 59715

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (JDH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#3

(#3) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/23/2023. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/29/2023. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/23/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2023 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. The preliminary pretrial conference will be conducted by Zoom. The Clerk of Court will notify counsel via e-mail of the meeting ID and password in advance of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/5/2023. (APP) Modified on 1/9/2023 SEND OUT ZOOM INFO WHEN ALL PARTIES APPEAR (APP). (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Riley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons. Served on Jolawn Allen, Authorized Agent of Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company on January 27, 2023, filed by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company answer due date 2/17/2023. (Riley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Riley on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Riley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default

#8

(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company (APP) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#9

(#9) Order Vacating the preliminary pretrial conference scheduled for April 5, 2023 and all associated deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 2/28/2023. (APP) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Vacating the preliminary pretrial conference scheduled for April 5, 2023 and all associated deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 2/28/2023. (APP) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company (APP) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Entry of Default Patrick C. Riley appearing for Plaintiff Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default) (Riley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Riley on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Riley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons. Served on Jolawn Allen, Authorized Agent of Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company on January 27, 2023, filed by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company answer due date 2/17/2023. (Riley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Riley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/23/2023. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/29/2023. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/23/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2023 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. The preliminary pretrial conference will be conducted by Zoom. The Clerk of Court will notify counsel via e-mail of the meeting ID and password in advance of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/5/2023. (APP) Modified on 1/9/2023 SEND OUT ZOOM INFO WHEN ALL PARTIES APPEAR (APP). (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-2994100 (JDH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (JDH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company, filed by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less