This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 08:43:07 (UTC).

RXC Acquisition Company v. Alkermes, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 RXC Acquisition Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alkermes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. Scriven and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02264

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WESLEY CHAPEL RX LLC

NEW CARE PHARMACY LLC

MEDICAL CENTER PHARMACY LLC

CANAL STREET PHARMACY LLC

TAMPA SPECIALTY PHARMACY LLC

PALM RX PHARMACY LLC

Brooksville Drugs Inc.

RX One Pharmacy, LLC

Blue Pharmacy LLC

POMP PHARMACY LLC

RICHEY PHARMACY LLC

MT. DORA PHARMACY LLC

MANGO PHARMACY LLC

PINELLAS PARK DRUGS LLC

TAMPA RX CARE LLC

MESQUITE PHARMACY LLC

COLFAX PHARMACY LLC

COASTAL DRUGS LLC

HENDERSONVILLE PHARMACY LLC

CROWN POINT PHARMACY LLC

193 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Leighton Leib

Attorney at KnoxLeib PLLC

420 West Platt Street

Tampa, FL 33606

Other Attorneys

Kathleen Schin McLeroy

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd, Ste. 1000

Tampa, FL 33607

David Stephen Johnson

Attorney at Johnson Daboll Anderson PLLC

2011 W Cleveland St Ste F

Tampa, FL 33606-1756

Robert Christopher Folland

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

4540 Pga Blvd., Ste. 208

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

Jordan Scott Cohen

Attorney at Wicker, Smith, O'Hara, McCoy & Ford, PA

515 E Las Olas Blvd - Ste 1400, Po Box 14460

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Brett M. Amron

Attorney at Bast Amron, LLP

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 1440

Miami, FL 33131-1708

Bradley Arthur Muhs

Attorney at Trenam Law

200 Central Ave Ste 1600

St Petersburg, FL 33701-3960

Joshua Golembe

Attorney at Nicklaus & Associates, PA

Suite 200, 4651 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Coral Gables, FL 33146

John F. Lauro

Attorney at Lauro Law Firm

400 N Tampa St, 15Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602-4719

Philip Matthew Luka

Attorney at Trombley & Hanes, PA

707 N Franklin St - 10Th Flr, Po Box 3356

Tampa, FL 33601-3356

Jason Alan Ross

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

John A. Tucker

Attorney at Foley & Lardner, LLP

1 Independent Dr - Ste 1300, Po Box 240

Jacksonville, FL 32202-0240

Philip Warren Crawford

Attorney at Gibbons, PC

2054 Vista Drive, Suite 400

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

Alan Mitchell Wolper

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

500 W. Madison Street, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60661

Anitra R. Clement

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

Harold Eugene Lindsey

Attorney at Katz, Barron, Squitero & Faust, PA

Suite 700, 2699 S Bayshore Dr

Miami, FL 33133-5425

 

Court Documents

#151

(#151) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent C.H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Cohen, Jordan) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#150

(#150) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Galderma Laboratories, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Galderma Laboratories, L.P. for Galderma Laboratories, L.P. (Muhs, Bradley) Modified text on 11/12/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#149

(#149) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lundbeck LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lundbeck USA Holding LLC, Other Affiliate H. Lundbeck A/S, Other Affiliate The Lundbeck Foundation for Lundbeck LLC. (Ross, Jason) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#147

(#147) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint by Mission Pharmacal Company. (Tucker, John) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#146

(#146) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Wolper, Alan) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

145 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#145

(#145) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jordan) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#144

(#144) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Scott Cohen on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Cohen, Jordan) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#143

(#143) RETURN of service executed on 11/5/21 by RXC Acquisition Company as to Stayma Consulting Services, LLC. (McLeroy, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Lawler's Pharmacy LLC. (TDC) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Alkermes, Inc., Amenia Drugs LLC, Antares Pharma, Inc., Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Battlecreek Pharmacy Inc., Benzer NJ 3 LLC, Benzer OH 10 LLC, Better Care Pharmacy LLC, Bio Script Pharmacy LLC, Blue Pharmacy LLC, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Brookside Drugs LLC, Brooksville Drugs Inc., Buddy's Pharmacy LLC, Byron Drugs LLC, Canal Street Pharmacy LLC, Celgene Corporation, Coastal Drugs LLC, Colfax Pharmacy LLC, Crown Point Pharmacy LLC, Currax Pharmaceuticals LLC, Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Dermira, Inc., Edwards Pharmacy of Indian Rocks LLC, Eyevance Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Fenton Pharmacy LLC, Frazeyburg Pharmacy LLC, Galderma Laboratories, L.P., Ganeshkrupa, LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Hari Om Pharmacy LLC, Hebron RX Care LLC, Hendersonville Pharmacy LLC, Kala Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kellogg Drugs LLC, Lancaster Drugs LLC, Loganville Drugs LLC, Lundbeck LLC, Mango Pharmacy LLC, Medical Center Pharmacy LLC, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Mesquite Pharmacy LLC, Miami Coast Pharmacy LLC, Mission Pharmacal Company, Mt. Dora Pharmacy LLC, New Care Pharmacy LLC, Newark Pharmacy LLC, North Saginaw Pharmacy, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Orexo US, Inc., Palm RX Pharmacy LLC, Pinellas Park Drugs LLC, Pomp Pharmacy LLC, Pronto-Med Inc., RX Care 10 LLC, RX Care 11 LLC, RX Care 13 LLC, RX Care 14 LLC, RX Care 16 LLC, RX Care Four LLC, RX Care Of NC LLC, RX Care of LA, Inc., RX Care of Lady Lake, Inc., RX One Pharmacy, LLC, Richey Pharmacy LLC, Rx Care of MI LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sky City Pharmacy LLC, Sprout Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stayma Consulting Services, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sunovion Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tampa RX Care LLC, Tampa Specialty Pharmacy LLC, Tersera Therapeutics LLC, USWM, LLC, Uniontown Pharmacy LLC, Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc., Village Drugs LLC, Vivus, Inc., Wellcare Pharmacy Services, Inc., Wesley Chapel RX LLC, White Oak Pharmacy LLC, Yellow Springs Pharmacy LLC. (TDC) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by RXC Acquisition Company. (McLeroy, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by RXC Acquisition Company. ***COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE PROPOSED SUMMONS ENTERED IN ERROR*** (McLeroy, Kathleen) Modified on 9/30/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kathleen Schin McLeroy on behalf of RXC Acquisition Company. Lead Counsel: Kathleen McLeroy. (McLeroy, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent C.H. Boehringer Sohn AG & Co. for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Cohen, Jordan) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Galderma Laboratories, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Galderma Laboratories, L.P. for Galderma Laboratories, L.P. (Muhs, Bradley) Modified text on 11/12/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lundbeck LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lundbeck USA Holding LLC, Other Affiliate H. Lundbeck A/S, Other Affiliate The Lundbeck Foundation for Lundbeck LLC. (Ross, Jason) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING AS SET FORTH HEREIN #145 #146 #147 Defendants' Motions for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. All Defendants that have been served as of the date of this Order shall have up to and including December 10, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/10/2021. (MWC) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint by Mission Pharmacal Company. (Tucker, John) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Wolper, Alan) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jordan) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Scott Cohen on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Cohen, Jordan) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) RETURN of service executed on 11/5/21 by RXC Acquisition Company as to Stayma Consulting Services, LLC. (McLeroy, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vivus, Inc.(Lindsey, Harold) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Genentech USA, Inc., Leo Pharma, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), Mayne Pharma, Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P. (TDC) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED summons to be issued by RXC Acquisition Company. (McLeroy, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Lawler's Pharmacy LLC. (TDC) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Alkermes, Inc., Amenia Drugs LLC, Antares Pharma, Inc., Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Astellas Pharma US, Inc., Battlecreek Pharmacy Inc., Benzer NJ 3 LLC, Benzer OH 10 LLC, Better Care Pharmacy LLC, Bio Script Pharmacy LLC, Blue Pharmacy LLC, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Brookside Drugs LLC, Brooksville Drugs Inc., Buddy's Pharmacy LLC, Byron Drugs LLC, Canal Street Pharmacy LLC, Celgene Corporation, Coastal Drugs LLC, Colfax Pharmacy LLC, Crown Point Pharmacy LLC, Currax Pharmaceuticals LLC, Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Dermira, Inc., Edwards Pharmacy of Indian Rocks LLC, Eyevance Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Fenton Pharmacy LLC, Frazeyburg Pharmacy LLC, Galderma Laboratories, L.P., Ganeshkrupa, LLC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Hari Om Pharmacy LLC, Hebron RX Care LLC, Hendersonville Pharmacy LLC, Kala Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kellogg Drugs LLC, Lancaster Drugs LLC, Loganville Drugs LLC, Lundbeck LLC, Mango Pharmacy LLC, Medical Center Pharmacy LLC, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Mesquite Pharmacy LLC, Miami Coast Pharmacy LLC, Mission Pharmacal Company, Mt. Dora Pharmacy LLC, New Care Pharmacy LLC, Newark Pharmacy LLC, North Saginaw Pharmacy, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Orexo US, Inc., Palm RX Pharmacy LLC, Pinellas Park Drugs LLC, Pomp Pharmacy LLC, Pronto-Med Inc., RX Care 10 LLC, RX Care 11 LLC, RX Care 13 LLC, RX Care 14 LLC, RX Care 16 LLC, RX Care Four LLC, RX Care Of NC LLC, RX Care of LA, Inc., RX Care of Lady Lake, Inc., RX One Pharmacy, LLC, Richey Pharmacy LLC, Rx Care of MI LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sky City Pharmacy LLC, Sprout Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stayma Consulting Services, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sunovion Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Tampa RX Care LLC, Tampa Specialty Pharmacy LLC, Tersera Therapeutics LLC, USWM, LLC, Uniontown Pharmacy LLC, Upsher-Smith Laboratories, Inc., Village Drugs LLC, Vivus, Inc., Wellcare Pharmacy Services, Inc., Wesley Chapel RX LLC, White Oak Pharmacy LLC, Yellow Springs Pharmacy LLC. (TDC) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by RXC Acquisition Company. (McLeroy, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by RXC Acquisition Company. ***COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE PROPOSED SUMMONS ENTERED IN ERROR*** (McLeroy, Kathleen) Modified on 9/30/2021 (TDC). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kathleen Schin McLeroy on behalf of RXC Acquisition Company. Lead Counsel: Kathleen McLeroy. (McLeroy, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to counsel to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:21-cv-2264-MSS-AAS. (SJB) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18746989) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLeroy, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALC Medical Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anitra R. Clement

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Alan Golembe(Designation Retained)